Sarsour et al v. Trump et al Featured Case

Council on American-Islamic Relations alleges that President Trump's executive order violates the Establishment and Free Exercise Clause of the First Amendment by treating Muslims less favorably than other groups, the Fifth Amendment, and the Administrative Procedure Act.

Plaintiff: Sarsour, Linda Sarsour, Rashida Tlaib, Zahra Billoo, Nihad Awad, Corey Saylor, Dawud Walid, Basim Elkarra, Hussam Ayloush, Hassan Shibly, Alia Salem, Adam Soltani, Imran Siddiqi, Julia Shearson, Namira Islam, Karen Dabdoub, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 3, John Doe No. 4, John Doe No. 5, John Doe No. 6, John Doe No. 7, John Doe No. 8, John Doe No. 9, John Doe No. 10, Jane Doe No. 1 and Jane Doe No. 2
Defendant: Walid, Donald J. Trump, John F. Kelly, U.S. Department of State and Director of National Intelligence
Petitioner: Janice Wolk Grenadier, Raquel Okyay, Vincent A. Molino and Victor Williams
Case Number: 1:2017cv00120
Filed: January 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Victor Williams (klau, )
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 So Ordered re #51 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with all parties to bear their own costs, including any possible attorneys' fees or other expenses of this litigation filed by U.S. Department of State, Director of National Intelligence, Donald J. Trump. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/25/21. (klau, ) Modified on 6/25/2021 (c/m on 6/25/21) (klau, ).
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by Director of National Intelligence, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State. (Barghaan, Dennis)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Motion to Stay. ORDERED that all proceedings in this action be, and the same hereby are, STAYED until further order of the Court. The Clerk is directed to place this matter on the inactive docket. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/9/18. (klau, )
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Joint MOTION to Stay by Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barghaan, Dennis)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Doe No. 5, Raquel Okyay, Dawud Walid, John Doe No. 10, John Doe No. 1, Linda Sarsour, John Doe No. 2, Karen Dabdoub, John Doe No. 9, Jane Doe No. 1, Jane Doe No. 2, Vincent A. Molino, Julia Shearson, John Doe No. 4, John Doe No. 8, Hassan Shibly, Alia Salem, John Doe No. 6, John Doe No. 7, Imran Siddiqi, Corey Saylor, Janice Wolk Grenadier, Rashida Tlaib, Hussam Ayloush, Adam Soltani, Namira Islam, Basim Elkarra, Zahra Billoo, John Doe No. 3, Nihad Awad.(Abbas, Gadeir)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that the stay previously imposed be, and the same hereby is, LIFTED for the limited purpose of allowing Plaintiffs leave to file an amended or supplemental complaint within forty-five days of the date of this Order. ORDERED that in the event that Plaintiffs timely file an amended or supplemental complaint, the stay is lifted in its entirely and the case shall proceed in accordance with the applicable rules and procedures. ORDERED that if Plaintiffs do not timely file an amended or supplemental complaint, the action shall be dismissed as moot. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/9/17. (klau, )
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Response to Show Cause Order filed by Nihad Awad, Hussam Ayloush, Zahra Billoo, Karen Dabdoub, Basim Elkarra, Janice Wolk Grenadier, Namira Islam, Jane Doe No. 1, Jane Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 10, John Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 3, John Doe No. 4, John Doe No. 5, John Doe No. 6, John Doe No. 7, John Doe No. 8, John Doe No. 9, Vincent A. Molino, Raquel Okyay, Alia Salem, Linda Sarsour, Corey Saylor, Julia Shearson, Hassan Shibly, Imran Siddiqi, Adam Soltani, Rashida Tlaib, Dawud Walid. (Abbas, Gadeir)
November 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Response to #44 Order filed by Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State. (Barghaan, Dennis)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER that within 10 days of this Order, the parties file written submissions to show cause, if any there be, why this case should not be dismissed as moot. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/25/17. (klau, )
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that the previously imposed stay in this matter [Doc. No. 42] be, and the same hereby is, CONTINUED pending the outcome of the appeal before the U.S. Supreme Court, styled Trump v. Int'l Refugee Assistance Project. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/18/17. (klau, )
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Consent Motion to Stay. ORDERED that all proceedings in this matter are hereby stayed until further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 4/24/17. (klau, )
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Consent MOTION to Stay the Proceedings by Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barghaan, Dennis)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on March 21, 2017, before Judge Anthony J. Trenga, Court Reporter/Transcriber Renecia Wilson, Telephone number,703-501-1580. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/15/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2017.(wilson, renecia)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: Presently pending before the Court is Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer [Doc. No. 38] (the "Motion"). Upon consideration of the Motion and the memorandum in support thereof, it is herebyORDERED that the Motion [Doc. No. 38] be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED andthat Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint no later than April 24, 2017. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 4/10/17. (yguy)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Initial Response by Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barghaan, Dennis)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that Plaintiffs' #13 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/24/17. (klau, )
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM OPINION re Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/24/17. (klau, )
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE by Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State of Fourth Circuit Briefing Schedule (amended to include attachment) (Attachments: #1 Fourth Circuit Briefing Order)(Barghaan, Dennis)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE by Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State of Fourth Circuit Briefing Schedule (Barghaan, Dennis)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #12 Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order and to Keep the Names of the John and Jane Doe Doe Plaintiffs Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 3/23/17. (klau, )
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J Trenga:Motion Hearing held on 3/21/2017. Appearances of counsel. Pltfs' #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction is argued in open court and TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT. (Court Reporter R. Wilson.)(yguy)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE by Nihad Awad, Hussam Ayloush, Zahra Billoo, Karen Dabdoub, Basim Elkarra, Namira Islam, Jane Doe No. 1, Jane Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 10, John Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 3, John Doe No. 4, John Doe No. 5, John Doe No. 6, John Doe No. 7, John Doe No. 8, John Doe No. 9, Alia Salem, Linda Sarsour, Corey Saylor, Julia Shearson, Hassan Shibly, Imran Siddiqi, Adam Soltani, Rashida Tlaib, Dawud Walid (Abbas, Gadeir)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE by Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State of Additional Authority (Barghaan, Dennis)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Waiver of Oral Argument by Nihad Awad, Hussam Ayloush, Zahra Billoo, Karen Dabdoub, Basim Elkarra, Janice Wolk Grenadier, Namira Islam, Jane Doe No. 1, Jane Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 10, John Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 3, John Doe No. 4, John Doe No. 5, John Doe No. 6, John Doe No. 7, John Doe No. 8, John Doe No. 9, Vincent A. Molino, Raquel Okyay, Alia Salem, Linda Sarsour, Corey Saylor, Julia Shearson, Hassan Shibly, Imran Siddiqi, Adam Soltani, Rashida Tlaib, Dawud Walid (Abbas, Gadeir)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE by Nihad Awad, Hussam Ayloush, Zahra Billoo, Karen Dabdoub, Basim Elkarra, Janice Wolk Grenadier, Namira Islam, Jane Doe No. 1, Jane Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 10, John Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 3, John Doe No. 4, John Doe No. 5, John Doe No. 6, John Doe No. 7, John Doe No. 8, John Doe No. 9, Vincent A. Molino, Raquel Okyay, Alia Salem, Linda Sarsour, Corey Saylor, Julia Shearson, Hassan Shibly, Imran Siddiqi, Adam Soltani, Rashida Tlaib, Dawud Walid re #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction [new evidence] (Abbas, Gadeir)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that #23 Motion for Leave to File a Brief Amicus Curiae be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED and Professor Williams' amicus brief is DEEMED filed as of March 17, 2017. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/20/17. Copy mailed: yes (klau, )
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/20/17. (klau, )
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/20/17. (klau, )
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of President Donald Trump filed by Victor Williams. (klau, ) Modified on 3/20/2017 to correct filed date (klau, ).
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File a Brief Amicus Curiae, Raising Political Question Nonjusticiability, from Professor Victor Williams of the America First Lawyers Association, in Support of President Donald J. Trump by Victor Williams. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Letter)(klau, )
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Memorandum in Opposition re #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State. (Barghaan, Dennis)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lena Masri and Certification of Local Counsel Gadeir Abbas Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5428101. by Nihad Awad, Hussam Ayloush, Zahra Billoo, Karen Dabdoub, Basim Elkarra, Janice Wolk Grenadier, Namira Islam, Jane Doe No. 1, Jane Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 10, John Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 3, John Doe No. 4, John Doe No. 5, John Doe No. 6, John Doe No. 7, John Doe No. 8, John Doe No. 9, Vincent A. Molino, Raquel Okyay, Alia Salem, Linda Sarsour, Corey Saylor, Julia Shearson, Hassan Shibly, Imran Siddiqi, Adam Soltani, Rashida Tlaib, Dawud Walid. (Abbas, Gadeir)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Shereef Akeel and Certification of Local Counsel Gadeir Abbas Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5427784. by Nihad Awad, Hussam Ayloush, Zahra Billoo, Karen Dabdoub, Basim Elkarra, Janice Wolk Grenadier, Namira Islam, Jane Doe No. 1, Jane Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 10, John Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 3, John Doe No. 4, John Doe No. 5, John Doe No. 6, John Doe No. 7, John Doe No. 8, John Doe No. 9, Vincent A. Molino, Raquel Okyay, Alia Salem, Linda Sarsour, Corey Saylor, Julia Shearson, Hassan Shibly, Imran Siddiqi, Adam Soltani, Rashida Tlaib, Dawud Walid. (Abbas, Gadeir)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Certificate of Service Returned Executed by Certified Mail as to John Kelly. (copy) (klau, )
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Certificate of Service Returned Executed by Certified mail as to U.S. Attorney, Attorney General and Donald Trump (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Letter)(klau, )
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Continue. The hearing on Defendants' Motion currently scheduled for March 13, 2017 be, and the same hereby is, CONTINUED to Tuesday, March 21, 2017 at 10 a.m.; and it is further ORDERED that Defendants file their opposition brief no later than Friday, March 17, 2017 at 12 p.m. noon. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 03/13/2017. (dvanm, )
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Continue Hearing Until Friday, March 17, 2017 by Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State. (Barghaan, Dennis)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr on behalf of Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State (Barghaan, Dennis)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Notice of Hearing Date re #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction (Abbas, Gadeir)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Hussam Ayloush, Basim Elkarra, John Doe No. 3, John Doe No. 5, John Doe No. 6, John Doe No. 7, John Doe No. 8, Adam Soltani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit I, #6 Exhibit J, #7 Exhibit L, #8 Exhibit M, #9 Exhibit N, #10 Exhibit O, #11 Exhibit P, #12 Exhibit R, #13 Exhibit S, #14 Exhibit T, #15 Exhibit U, #16 Exhibit V, #17 Exhibit W, #18 Exhibit X, #19 Exhibit Y, #20 Exhibit Z, #21 Exhibit AA)(Abbas, Gadeir)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Protective Order and to Keep the Names of the John and Jane Doe Doe Plaintiffs Under Seal by Jane Doe No. 1, Jane Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 10, John Doe No. 3, John Doe No. 4, John Doe No. 5, John Doe No. 6, John Doe No. 7, John Doe No. 8, John Doe No. 9. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Donald J. Trump Statement on Preventing Muslim Immigration, #2 Exhibit V - First Muslim Ban, #3 Exhibit W - Revised Muslim Ban, #4 Exhibit Z -)(Abbas, Gadeir)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF AND JURY DEMAND against Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State, filed by Alia Salem, John Doe No. 5, John Doe No. 10, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 6, Linda Sarsour, Imran Siddiqi, John Doe No. 7, Karen Dabdoub, Corey Saylor, Jane Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 9, Jane Doe No. 2, Rashida Tlaib, Hussam Ayloush, Adam Soltani, Julia Shearson, Namira Islam, John Doe No. 4, Basim Elkarra, Zahra Billoo, John Doe No. 8, Hassan Shibly, John Doe No. 3, Nihad Awad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Muslim Ban, #2 Exhibit Revised Muslim Ban, #3 Exhibit 9th Circuit Decision Upholding Nationwide Injunction, #4 Exhibit EDNY Injunction, #5 Exhibit EDVA Injunction, #6 Exhibit WDWA Injunction, #7 Exhibit EDCA Injunction, #8 Exhibit EDMA Injunction)(Abbas, Gadeir)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (dvanm, )
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to 13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to 13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 3/21/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (dvanm, )
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to 13 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 12 MOTION for Protective Order and to Keep the Names of the John and Jane Doe Doe Plaintiffs Under Seal. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument.(gwalk, )
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re #12 MOTION for Protective Order and to Keep the Names of the John and Jane Doe Doe Plaintiffs Under Seal. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument.(gwalk, )
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Intervene (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/3/17. Copy mailed to Mr. Molino. (klau, )
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued for service by Certified Mail as to John F. Kelly, NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out ONE electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(klau, )
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to F.R.C.P.24 by Vincent A. Molino. (Told to Notice) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(klau, ) Modified text on 2/28/2017 (klau, ).
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons Issued for service by Certified Mail as to Donald J. Trump, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out one electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(klau, )
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re 6 Proposed Summons, An incomplete summons for defendant John F. Kelly was filed. The filing user has been notified to refile the document. (klau, )
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Notice of Correction re #6 Proposed Summons, An incomplete summons for defendant John F. Kelly was filed. The filing user has been notified to refile the document. (klau, )
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Proposed Summons by Nihad Awad, Hussam Ayloush, Zahra Billoo, Karen Dabdoub, Basim Elkarra, Janice Wolk Grenadier, Namira Islam, Jane Doe No. 1, Jane Doe No. 2, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 10, John Doe No. 3, John Doe No. 4, John Doe No. 5, John Doe No. 6, John Doe No. 7, John Doe No. 8, John Doe No. 9, Raquel Okyay, Alia Salem, Linda Sarsour, Corey Saylor, Julia Shearson, Hassan Shibly, Imran Siddiqi, Adam Soltani, Rashida Tlaib. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Letter)(Abbas, Gadeir)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that the motions to Intervene #2 #4 be, and the same hereby are, DENIED. ORDERED that the hearing on Grenadier's motion, currently scheduled for February 24, 2017 be, and the same hereby is, CANCELED (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 2/6/17. Copy mailed to pro se movants. (klau, )
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Intervene in Support of President Donald J. Trump et al. by Raquel Okyay. (Told to Notice) (klau, )
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION to Intervene : Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (klau, )
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Intervene in Support of President Donald J. Trump et al. by Janice Wolk Grenadier. (klau, )
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5353656), filed by Alia Salem, John Doe No. 5, Dawud Walid, John Doe No. 10, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 6, Linda Sarsour, John Doe No. 2, Imran Siddiqi, John Doe No. 7, Karen Dabdoub, Corey Saylor, John Doe No. 9, Jane Doe No. 1, Jane Doe No. 2, Rashida Tlaib, Hussam Ayloush, Adam Soltani, Julia Shearson, Namira Islam, John Doe No. 4, Basim Elkarra, Zahra Billoo, John Doe No. 8, Hassan Shibly, John Doe No. 3, Nihad Awad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Executive Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit EDVA TRO, #3 Exhibit Exhibit EDNY TRO, #4 Exhibit Exhibit WDWA TRO, #5 Exhibit Exhibit EDCA TRO, #6 Exhibit Exhibit EDMA TRO, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(jlan)
January 30, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Director of National Intelligence, John F. Kelly, Donald J. Trump, U.S. Department of State (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5353656), filed by Alia Salem, John Doe No. 5, Dawud Walid, John Doe No. 10, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 6, Linda Sarsour, John Doe No. 2, Imran Siddiqi, John Doe No. 7, Karen Dabdoub, Corey Saylor, John Doe No. 9, Jane Doe No. 1, Jane Doe No. 2, Rashida Tlaib, Hussam Ayloush, Adam Soltani, Julia Shearson, Namira Islam, John Doe No. 4, Basim Elkarra, Zahra Billoo, John Doe No. 8, Hassan Shibly, John Doe No. 3, Nihad Awad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit Executive Order, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit EDVA TRO, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit EDNY TRO, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit WDWA TRO, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit EDCA TRO, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit EDMA TRO, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet)(jlan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sarsour et al v. Trump et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarsour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Sarsour
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashida Tlaib
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zahra Billoo
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nihad Awad
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Saylor
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawud Walid
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basim Elkarra
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hussam Ayloush
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassan Shibly
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alia Salem
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Soltani
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imran Siddiqi
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Shearson
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Namira Islam
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Dabdoub
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe No. 1
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe No. 2
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe No. 3
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe No. 4
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe No. 5
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe No. 6
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe No. 7
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe No. 8
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe No. 9
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe No. 10
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 1
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe No. 2
Represented By: Gadeir Ibrahim Abbas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Kelly
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of National Intelligence
Represented By: Dennis Carl Barghaan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Janice Wolk Grenadier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Raquel Okyay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vincent A. Molino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Victor Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?