Jarvis v. The City of Alexandria Mayor's Office et al
Plaintiff: Derek N. Jarvis
Defendant: The City of Alexandria Mayor's Office, Alexandria City Counsel and Alexandria City Manager
Case Number: 1:2017cv00378
Filed: March 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Alexandria City
Presiding Judge: John F. Anderson
Presiding Judge: James C. Cacheris
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 06/28/2017. (c/s to Plaintiff)(jlan)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OPINION Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 6/22/17. (gwalk, ) ORDER TO FOLLOW
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge James C. Cacheris on 06/12/2017. (jlan) (c/s to pro se Plaintiff)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarvis v. The City of Alexandria Mayor's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek N. Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Alexandria Mayor's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandria City Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandria City Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?