J.E.C.M. et al v. Lloyd et al
Plaintiff: Cinthia Velasquez Trail, Sandra Alvarado and Blanca Jeronimo Sis
Petitioner: Jose Jiminez Saravia, J.E.C.M., B.G.S.S., K.T.M. and R.A.I.
Respondent: Alex Azar, Natasha David, Steven Wagner, Johnitha McNair, Scott Lloyd, Gary L. Jones and Timothy Smith
Case Number: 1:2018cv00903
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Alexandria City
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Set Deadlines as to Motion Hearing set for 10/26/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (see Order #32 for details) (dvanm, )
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File. It is furtherORDERED that Defendants shall file any dispositive motion with respect to the Second Amended Complaint on or before September 21, 2018; Plaintiffs may file an opposition to Defendants' motion on or before October 12, 2018; Defendants may file any reply memorandum on or before October 19, 2018; and argument on Defendants' motion shall be held on October 26,2018. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 09/12/2018. (dvanm, )
September 12, 2018 Filing 31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint by Alex Azar, Natasha David, Gary L. Jones, Scott Lloyd, Johnitha McNair, Timothy Smith, Steven Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yang, Catherine)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 08/20/2018. (dvanm, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 29 Memorandum in Support re #28 Supplemental MOTION to Certify Class filed by Sandra Alvarado, B.G.S.S., J.E.C.M., Blanca Jeronimo Sis, K.T.M., R.A.I., Jose Jiminez Saravia, Cinthia Velasquez Trail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Wolozin, Rebecca)
August 17, 2018 Filing 28 Supplemental MOTION to Certify Class by B.G.S.S., J.E.C.M., K.T.M., R.A.I., Jose Jiminez Saravia, Blanca Jeronimo Sis, Sandra Alvarado, Cinthia Velasquez Trail. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wolozin, Rebecca)
August 17, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Salvador Manuel Bezos on behalf of B.G.S.S., K.T.M., R.A.I. (Bezos, Salvador)
August 17, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by John Christopher Rozendaal on behalf of B.G.S.S., K.T.M., R.A.I. (Rozendaal, John)
August 17, 2018 Filing 25 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by B.G.S.S., J.E.C.M., K.T.M., R.A.I., Jose Jiminez Saravia re #22 MOTION to Seal (Wolozin, Rebecca)
August 17, 2018 Notice of Correction re #22 MOTION to Seal . The filing user has been notified to file the Local Civil Rule 5(B) Notice. (dvanm, )
August 16, 2018 Filing 24 Waiver of re #22 MOTION to Seal Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by J.E.C.M., Jose Jiminez Saravia (Wolozin, Rebecca)
August 16, 2018 Filing 23 Memorandum in Support re #22 MOTION to Seal filed by J.E.C.M., Jose Jiminez Saravia. (Wolozin, Rebecca)
August 16, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Seal by J.E.C.M., Jose Jiminez Saravia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wolozin, Rebecca)
August 16, 2018 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Class Action Complaint and Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus against Alex Azar, Natasha David, Scott Lloyd, Johnitha McNair, Steven Wagner, filed by J.E.C.M., Jose Jiminez Saravia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit)(Wolozin, Rebecca)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - The parties having agreed upon the filing of a Second Amended Complaint and a briefing schedule in this matter, and for good cause shown, the court hereby ORDERS as follows: 1. By consent of all parties, Petitioners may file a Second Amended Complaint on August 16, 2018. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 08/16/2018. (see order for full details)(dvanm, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 19 Memorandum in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Alex Azar, Natasha David, Scott Lloyd, Johnitha McNair, Steven Wagner. (Attachments: #1 DEX A)(Yang, Catherine)
August 3, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Certify Class . Responses due by 8/10/2018 Replies due by 8/20/2018. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (rban, )
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part #17 Motion for Briefing Schedule. ORDERED that respondents file their opposition to petitioner's Motion for Class Certification on or before 8/10/2018; that petitioners file their reply in support of their Motion for Class Certification on or before 8/20/2018; that the hearing on petitioners' Motion for Class Certification #5 be and is CONTINUED from 8/31/2018 until 9/7/2018 at 10 a.m. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/3/2018. (rban, )
August 3, 2018 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule by Alex Azar, Natasha David, Scott Lloyd, Johnitha McNair, Steven Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yang, Catherine)
July 31, 2018 Filing 16 Proposed Summons re #4 Amended Petition,, by J.E.C.M., Jose Jiminez Saravia. (Wolozin, Rebecca)
July 30, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE by J.E.C.M., Jose Jiminez Saravia re #14 Order,, Notice Regarding Non-Mootness (Wolozin, Rebecca)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDERED that the briefing schedule related to the Court's Order to Show Cause #3 be and is VACATED; that the hearing on the habeas corpus petition currently scheduled for 9:30 a.m. on Thursday, 8/2/2018 be and is CANCELED; that petitioners immediately advise the Court what, if any issues remain to be resolved in the current lawsuit and, specifically, whether the current lawsuit is moot in light of the apparent resolution of all issues related to the only named petitioners. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/30/2018. (rban, )
July 27, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE by Alex Azar, Natasha David, Scott Lloyd, Johnitha McNair, Steven Wagner (Joint) (Barghaan, Dennis)
July 25, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Certify Class . Motion Hearing set for 8/31/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (klau, )
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File; and it is further ORDERED that Respondents show cause by Monday, July 30, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. why the habeas petition should not be granted, and that any reply to Respondents' brief be filed by Wednesday, August 1, 2018. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 07/24/2018. (dvanm, )
July 24, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Petitioner's Habeas Petition by Alex Azar, Natasha David, Scott Lloyd, Johnitha McNair, Steven Wagner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yang, Catherine)
July 24, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Hearing Date re #5 MOTION to Certify Class (Wolozin, Rebecca)
July 23, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Salvador Manuel Bezos on behalf of J.E.C.M., Jose Jiminez Saravia (Bezos, Salvador)
July 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John Christopher Rozendaal on behalf of J.E.C.M., Jose Jiminez Saravia (Rozendaal, John)
July 23, 2018 Set Deadline as to #5 MOTION to Certify Class. Motion Hearing set for 8/2/2018 at 09:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (jlan)
July 21, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Hearing Date set for August 2, 2018 re #5 MOTION to Certify Class (Wolozin, Rebecca)
July 21, 2018 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Certify Class filed by J.E.C.M., Jose Jiminez Saravia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Wolozin, Rebecca)
July 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Certify Class by J.E.C.M., Jose Jiminez Saravia. (Wolozin, Rebecca)
July 21, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED Petition and Class Action Complaint against Alex Azar, Natasha David, Scott Lloyd, Johnitha McNair, Steven Wagner, filed by J.E.C.M., Jose Jiminez Saravia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SWK Discharge Notification, #2 Exhibit SCH Discharge Notification, #3 Exhibit ORR Notification to ICE CC, #4 Exhibit Memorandum of Agreement, #5 Exhibit Sponsor Reunification Packet, #6 Exhibit ORR Policy Guide, #7 Exhibit ORR Record of Posting and Revision Dates)(Wolozin, Rebecca)
July 20, 2018 Set Deadlines as to Hearing set for 8/2/2018 at 09:30 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (see order #3 ) (dvanm, )
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; ORDER of Service (2241) upon respondents. Given J.E.C.M.'s young age and the length of time he has spent in custody, it is hereby ORDERED that respondents SHOW CAUSE by Friday, July 27, 2018 why the habeas corpus petition should not be granted; and it is further ORDERED that any reply to respondents' brief be filed by Tuesday, July 31, 2018; and it is further ORDERED that the parties appear for a hearing on the habeas corpus petition at 9:30 a.m. on Thursday, August 2, 2018. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 07/20/2018. (c/s to USAO)(dvanm, )
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg on behalf of J.E.C.M., Jose Jiminez Saravia (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0422-6187464.), filed by J.E.C.M., Jose Jiminez Saravia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.E.C.M. et al v. Lloyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Jiminez Saravia
Represented By: Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Wolozin
Represented By: John Christopher Rozendaal
Represented By: Salvador Manuel Bezos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: J.E.C.M.
Represented By: Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Wolozin
Represented By: John Christopher Rozendaal
Represented By: Salvador Manuel Bezos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: B.G.S.S.
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Wolozin
Represented By: John Christopher Rozendaal
Represented By: Salvador Manuel Bezos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: K.T.M.
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Wolozin
Represented By: John Christopher Rozendaal
Represented By: Salvador Manuel Bezos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: R.A.I.
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Wolozin
Represented By: John Christopher Rozendaal
Represented By: Salvador Manuel Bezos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alex Azar
Represented By: Catherine M. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Natasha David
Represented By: Catherine M. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Wagner
Represented By: Catherine M. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Johnitha McNair
Represented By: Catherine M. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Lloyd
Represented By: Catherine M. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gary L. Jones
Represented By: Catherine M. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy Smith
Represented By: Catherine M. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cinthia Velasquez Trail
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Wolozin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Alvarado
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Wolozin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Jeronimo Sis
Represented By: Rebecca Ruth Wolozin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?