A.R.D.A., a minor, by and through his next friend Nestor Rosales Dubon; and Nestor Rosales Dubon in his individual capacity v. Lloyd et al
Petitioner: A.R.D.A., a minor, by and through his next friend Nestor Rosales Dubon; and Nestor Rosales Dubon in his individual capacity, Nestor Rosales Dubon and A.R.D.A.
Respondent: Alex Azar, Natasha David, Jonitha McNair, Steven Wagner, Scott Lloyd and Jonathan White
Case Number: 1:2018cv00944
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Alexandria City
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Liam O'Grady:Status Conference held on 9/27/2018. Counsel enter their appearances and inform the Court that they are still working towards a resolution. Counsel request a continuance of this hearing. Status Conference set for 10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (Court Reporter N. Linnell.)(awac, )
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER setting status conference for 9/27/2018 at 9:00 a.m. A.R.D.A. will not need to be present. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/21/2018. (awac, )
August 21, 2018 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Liam O'Grady:Docket Call held on 8/21/2018. Minor petitioner appeared with Adina Appelbaum. Respondent appeared through Rebecca Levenson. Counsel update Court on case status. Status Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. Petitioner remains in custody. (Court Reporter N. Linnell.)(awac, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by Alex Azar, Natasha David, Scott Lloyd, Steven Wagner, Jonathan White (Levenson, Rebecca)
August 20, 2018 Filing 23 Sealed Document. (Levenson, Rebecca)
August 16, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE by A.R.D.A., a minor, by and through his next friend Nestor Rosales Dubon; and Nestor Rosales Dubon in his individual capacity re #6 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s),, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),,, Notice of Withdrawal of Counts Two and Three and Dismissal of Plaintiff (Appelbaum, Adina)
August 16, 2018 Filing 21 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by A.R.D.A., a minor, by and through his next friend Nestor Rosales Dubon; and Nestor Rosales Dubon in his individual capacity re #20 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition (Appelbaum, Adina)
August 16, 2018 Filing 20 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7, #8 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Appelbaum, Adina)
August 13, 2018 Filing 19 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by Alex Azar, Natasha David, Scott Lloyd, Steven Wagner, Jonathan White (Levenson, Rebecca)
August 13, 2018 Filing 18 Sealed Response re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REX 1, #2 Exhibit REX 2, #3 Exhibit REX 3, #4 Exhibit REX 4, #5 Exhibit REX 5, #6 Exhibit REX 6)(Levenson, Rebecca)
August 13, 2018 Filing 17 Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),,, (redacted) filed by Alex Azar, Natasha David, Scott Lloyd, Steven Wagner, Jonathan White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit REX 1 (redacted), #2 Exhibit REX 2 (under seal), #3 Exhibit REX 3 (under seal), #4 Exhibit REX 4 (under seal), #5 Exhibit REX 5 (under seal), #6 Exhibit REX 6 (under seal))(Levenson, Rebecca)
August 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca S. Levenson on behalf of Alex Azar, Natasha David, Scott Lloyd, Steven Wagner, Jonathan White (Levenson, Rebecca)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER-The hearing in this matter is hereby moved to 2:00 pm on August 21, 2018 in Courtroom 600. (lcre, ).
August 8, 2018 Filing 14 Docketed in Error and Removed.(lcre, ) Modified on 8/8/2018 (lcre, ). (Main Document 14 replaced on 8/8/2018) (lcre, ).
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice of David Laing. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/7/2018. (lcre, )
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice of Claudia Cubas. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/7/2018. (lcre, )
August 1, 2018 Docket Call set re Oral Argument Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for 8/21/2018 at 01:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (lcre, )
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER- It is hereby Ordered that the re #4 Motion for Order to Show Cause is GRANTED. Respondents have 10 days' from the date of this Order to SHOW CAUSE why Petitioners' petition for a writ of habeas corpus should not be granted (Please See Order for Details). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/1/2018. (lcre, )(c/s per ORDER)
August 1, 2018 Filing 10 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Laing and Certification of Local Counsel Adina Appelbaum Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6207267. by A.R.D.A., a minor, by and through his next friend Nestor Rosales Dubon; and Nestor Rosales Dubon in his individual capacity. (Appelbaum, Adina)
August 1, 2018 Filing 9 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Claudia Cubas and Certification of Local Counsel Adina Appelbaum Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6207255. by A.R.D.A., a minor, by and through his next friend Nestor Rosales Dubon; and Nestor Rosales Dubon in his individual capacity. (Appelbaum, Adina)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - It is hereby ORDERED that the re #2 MOTION to Seal is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to maintain documents provided in Docket Entry No. #6 under seal until otherwise ordered by the Court. However, because all docket entries in this case appear to be designated as sealed despite Petitioners-Plaintiffs only seeking certain documents to be filed under seal, it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court unseal all docket entries aside from Docket Entry No. #6 in this case. It is further ORDERED that all documents filed by parties in this case containing Petitioner-Plaintiff A.R.D.A. 's sensitive custody or medical information be filed under seal. All parties in this action are directed to comply with Local Civil Rule 5(B) when seeking to file any document or a portion of a document under seal that involves minor Petitioner-Plaintiff A.R.D.A. 's sensitive custody or medical information. If such documents can be redacted, then redacted versions of such documents must be publicly filed. The parties may cite this Order as allowing such documents or portions of documents to be filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 8/1/2018. (lcre, )
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by A.R.D.A., a minor, by and through his next friend Nestor Rosales Dubon; and Nestor Rosales Dubon in his individual capacity re #6 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s),, (Appelbaum, Adina)
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241),,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12, #13 Exhibit Ex. 13, #14 Exhibit Ex. 14, #15 Exhibit Ex. 15, #16 Exhibit Ex. 16, #17 Exhibit Ex. 17, #18 Exhibit Ex. 18, #19 Exhibit Ex. 19, #20 Exhibit Ex. 20, #21 Exhibit Ex. 21, #22 Exhibit Ex. 22, #23 Exhibit Ex. 23, #24 Exhibit Ex. 24, #25 Exhibit Ex. 25, #26 Exhibit Ex. 26, #27 Exhibit Ex. 27)(Appelbaum, Adina)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 Docketed in Error and Removed. Modified on 7/31/2018 (lcre, ). (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/31/2018) (lcre, ). (Main Document 5 replaced on 7/31/2018) (lcre, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/31/2018) (lcre, ).
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by A.R.D.A., a minor, by and through his next friend Nestor Rosales Dubon; and Nestor Rosales Dubon in his individual capacity. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(lcre, )
July 31, 2018 Notice of Correction : The filing user has been notified to file the Local Civil Rule 5(B) Notice re #6 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) (lcre, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Seal and Redact filed by A.R.D.A., a minor, by and through his next friend Nestor Rosales Dubon; and Nestor Rosales Dubon in his individual capacity. (lcre, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal and Redact by A.R.D.A., a minor, by and through his next friend Nestor Rosales Dubon; and Nestor Rosales Dubon in his individual capacity. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(lcre, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0422-6203831.), filed by A.R.D.A., a minor, by and through his next friend Nestor Rosales Dubon; and Nestor Rosales Dubon in his individual capacity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Proposed Summons, #29 Civil Cover Sheet)(lcre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.R.D.A., a minor, by and through his next friend Nestor Rosales Dubon; and Nestor Rosales Dubon in his individual capacity v. Lloyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alex Azar
Represented By: Rebecca S. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Natasha David
Represented By: Rebecca S. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jonitha McNair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steven Wagner
Represented By: Rebecca S. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Lloyd
Represented By: Rebecca S. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jonathan White
Represented By: Rebecca S. Levenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: A.R.D.A., a minor, by and through his next friend Nestor Rosales Dubon; and Nestor Rosales Dubon in his individual capacity
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nestor Rosales Dubon
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: A.R.D.A.
Represented By: Adina Bassin Appelbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?