Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc. v. Guan
Plaintiff: Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.
Defendant: Fei Guan
Case Number: 1:2018cv00988
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
County: Fairfax
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1831
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 75 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc. re #73 Amended MOTION to Seal Dkt. Nos. 27, 27-1, 42, and 42-1 (Bagley, Andrew)
October 1, 2018 Filing 74 Memorandum in Support re #73 Amended MOTION to Seal Dkt. Nos. 27, 27-1, 42, and 42-1 filed by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.. (Bagley, Andrew)
October 1, 2018 Filing 73 Amended MOTION to Seal Dkt. Nos. 27, 27-1, 42, and 42-1 by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Bagley, Andrew)
September 26, 2018 Filing 72 Memorandum in Support re #68 Amended MOTION to Seal [50 - 52] filed by Fei Guan. (Tripp, David)
September 26, 2018 Filing 71 Opposition to #51 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B), #68 Amended MOTION to Seal [50 - 52], #58 Order, Redacted filed by Fei Guan. (Tripp, David)
September 26, 2018 Filing 70 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by Fei Guan re #68 Amended MOTION to Seal [50 - 52] (Tripp, David)
September 26, 2018 Filing 69 Waiver of re #68 Amended MOTION to Seal [50 - 52] Oral Argument by Fei Guan (Tripp, David)
September 26, 2018 Filing 68 Amended MOTION to Seal [50 - 52] by Fei Guan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tripp, David)
September 26, 2018 Filing 67 Memorandum in Support re #63 Amended MOTION to Seal Previous Filings [20-22 and 22-1] filed by Fei Guan. (Tripp, David)
September 26, 2018 Filing 66 Amended MOTION to Vacate #63 Amended MOTION to Seal Previous Filings [20-22 and 22-1], #21 Exparte, Memorandum, #9 Order on Motion for TRO,, #58 Order, by Fei Guan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redacted Guan Declaration, #2 Exhibit Notice of Deposition)(Tripp, David)
September 26, 2018 Filing 65 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by Fei Guan re #63 Amended MOTION to Seal Previous Filings [20-22 and 22-1], #21 Exparte, Memorandum, #22 SEALED MOTION, #20 SEALED MOTION (Tripp, David)
September 26, 2018 Filing 64 Waiver of re #63 Amended MOTION to Seal Previous Filings [20-22 and 22-1] Oral Argument by Fei Guan (Tripp, David)
September 26, 2018 Filing 63 Amended MOTION to Seal Previous Filings [20-22 and 22-1] by Fei Guan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tripp, David)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDERED that this Court's Report and Recommendation #61 is to remain UNDER SEAL until further order of the Court. A redacted version of the Report and Recommendation is available on the public docket sheet #60 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 9/21/2018. (rban, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 61 Unredacted Report and Recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 9/20/2018. (rban, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 60 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Objections to R&R due by 10/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 9/20/2018. (rban, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 59 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Fei Guan.(Tripp, David)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDERED that the parties are to confer as to what information is required to be filed under seal and file unsealed, redacted versions in the public docket. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant (Dkts. 20, 50) and Plaintiff (Dkts. 28, 43) file revised Motions to Seal, each with an accompanying non-confidential memorandum that addresses all four factors, as required by Local Rule 5(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 09/13/2018. (jlan)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 PROTECTIVE ORDER re Handling and Labeling Confidential Information. See Order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 9/10/2018. (rban, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 56 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Rule 502 Order)(Bagley, Andrew)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's Emergency Motion to Compel Compliance with Preliminary Injunction Order. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/5/2018. (awac, )
September 4, 2018 Filing 54 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Liam O'Grady:Sealed Minutes held on 9/4/2018. (Court Reporter N. Linnell.)(awac, )
September 3, 2018 Filing 53 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #52 Sealed Document, #50 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. (Tripp, David)
September 3, 2018 Filing 52 Sealed Document re #43 MOTION to Seal , #44 Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tripp, David)
September 3, 2018 Filing 51 Notice of Under Seal Filing LCvR5 (B) by Fei Guan re #50 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Tripp, David)
September 3, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Fei Guan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tripp, David)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fei Guan answer due 9/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 08/31/2018. (jlan)
August 30, 2018 Filing 48 Memorandum in Support re #47 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unoppose by Plaintiff filed by Fei Guan. (Tripp, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 47 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unoppose by Plaintiff by Fei Guan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tripp, David)
August 30, 2018 Filing 46 Notice of Hearing Date September 4, 2018 re #41 Sealed Document (Bagley, Andrew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 45 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc. re #43 MOTION to Seal Docket Nos. 41 and 42 (Bagley, Andrew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 44 Memorandum in Support re #43 MOTION to Seal filed by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.. (Bagley, Andrew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION to Seal by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bagley, Andrew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 42 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #41 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bagley, Andrew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 41 Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bagley, Andrew)
August 30, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE by Fei Guan re #37 Preliminary Injunction, Terminate Motions of Complaince re Privileged Communications (Tripp, David)
August 30, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion Hearing re: #41 Sealed Document set for 9/4/2018 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (awac, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE by Fei Guan re #37 Preliminary Injunction, Terminate Motions of Compliance (Tripp, David)
August 28, 2018 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of Service Defendant's Confidential Identification of Devices and Accounting re #37 Preliminary Injunction, Terminate Motions by David G. Tripp on behalf of Fei Guan (Tripp, David)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER - this Court enters this Preliminary Injunction in place of the TRO effective immediately. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/24/2018. (awac, )
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Pro hac vice - David B. Robbins. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/23/2018. (lgue, )
August 23, 2018 Filing 35 Response to Defendant's Proposed Edits to Proposed PI Order, filed by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.. (Bagley, Andrew)
August 23, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE by Fei Guan re #32 NOTICE of filing of proposed revisions to plaintiff's proposed PI order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Mark-up version, #2 Proposed Order "Clean" Version)(Tripp, David)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/21/2018. (aott)
August 22, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc. of Filing of Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bagley, Andrew)
August 21, 2018 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Liam O'Grady:Sealed Minutes held on 8/21/2018. (Court Reporter N. Linnell.)(awac, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 30 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc. re #28 MOTION to Seal Docket No. 27 (Bagley, Andrew)
August 20, 2018 Filing 29 Memorandum in Support re #28 MOTION to Seal filed by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.. (Bagley, Andrew)
August 20, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION to Seal by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bagley, Andrew)
August 20, 2018 Filing 27 Response to #20 SEALED MOTION filed by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bagley, Andrew)
August 20, 2018 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 Emergency MOTION to Compel Compliance with August 13, 2018 TRO filed by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.. (Bagley, Andrew)
August 20, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE by Fei Guan re #20 SEALED MOTION Proposed Sealing Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tripp, David)
August 20, 2018 Filing 24 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David B. Robbins and Certification of Local Counsel Andrew Bagley Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6236001. by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.. (Bagley, Andrew)
August 20, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Michael Crawford on behalf of Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc. (Crawford, Jason)
August 20, 2018 Filing 19 Opposition to #15 Emergency MOTION to Compel Compliance with August 13, 2018 TRO filed by Fei Guan. (Tripp, David)
August 20, 2018 Filing 18 Notice of Hearing Date August 21, 2018 re #14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James E. Hopenfeld and Certification of Local Counsel David G. Tripp Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6233149. (Tripp, David)
August 20, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James E. Hopenfeld and Certification of Local Counsel David G. Tripp Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6233149. . Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2018 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
August 17, 2018 Filing 22 Ex Parte Under Seal Motion. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(jlan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 21 Ex Parte Under Seal Memorandum in re #20 Ex Parte Under Seal Motion. (jlan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 20 Ex Parte Under Seal Motion. (jlan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 17 Notice of Hearing Date set for August 20, 2018 re #15 Emergency MOTION to Compel Compliance with August 13, 2018 TRO (Bagley, Andrew)
August 17, 2018 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 Emergency MOTION to Compel Compliance with August 13, 2018 TRO filed by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bagley, Andrew)
August 17, 2018 Filing 15 Emergency MOTION to Compel Compliance with August 13, 2018 TRO by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bagley, Andrew)
August 17, 2018 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James E. Hopenfeld and Certification of Local Counsel David G. Tripp Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6233149. by Fei Guan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application)(Tripp, David)
August 17, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Tripp on behalf of Fei Guan (Tripp, David)
August 17, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #15 Emergency MOTION to Compel Compliance with August 13, 2018 TRO. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2018 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (per LO chambers) (clar, )
August 15, 2018 Filing 12 TRO BOND in the amount of $ 50,000 posted by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc. (jlan)
August 14, 2018 Alexandria Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 8/21/2018 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (rban, )
August 13, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc. re #9 Order on Motion for TRO,, STATEMENT REGARDING DEFENDANTS RECEIPT OF COURTS ORDER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bagley, Andrew)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for TRO. ORDERED that a Temporary Restraining Order shall be issued immediately; that Plaintiff AdSTM shall post a security bond in the amount of $50,000.00 no later than 48 hours after the issuance of this Order in the Registry of the Court; that the parties shall appear on 8/21/2018 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 600 before Judge Liam O'Grady for a hearing on a Preliminary Injunction. This Temporary Restraining Order shall take effect immediately and remain in effect pending further Order of the Court. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 8/13/2018. (rban, )
August 10, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Fei Guan served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018 (jlan)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc. re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery Regarding Personal Service on Defendant (Bagley, Andrew)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen John McBrady on behalf of Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc. (McBrady, Stephen)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Hearing Date set for August 14, 2018 re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery (Bagley, Andrew)
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery filed by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bagley, Andrew)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , Preliminary Injunction, and Expedited Discovery by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bagley, Andrew)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Fei Guan. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc. (jlan)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fei Guan (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6221026) filed by Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jlan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc. v. Guan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Systems Technology and Management, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew William Bagley
Represented By: Stephen John McBrady
Represented By: Jason Michael Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fei Guan
Represented By: David G. Tripp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?