Ahn v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sung R. Ahn
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., ALG Trustee, LLC, Nationstar Mortgage LLC and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv01048
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, defendants' Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, and ALG Trustee, LLC Motions to Dismiss [Dkt. Nos. 5 and 15] be and are GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs Complaint be and is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/5/18. (yguy)
October 5, 2018 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 10/5/2018. Appearances of counsel. Court advised of case status. Defts #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim are argued and GRANTED. (order to follow) (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy)
October 4, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Settlement (Joint), with MERS by Sung R. Ahn (Smith, Juliane)
October 4, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Syed Mohsin Reza on behalf of Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Reza, Syed)
October 4, 2018 Reset Deadline as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2018 at 09:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (jlan)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED that the motions scheduled for hearing at 10:00 a.m. on Friday, October 5, 2018 be and are advanced to 9:00 a.m. on Friday, October 5, 2018. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 10/04/2018. (jlan)
October 3, 2018 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ALG Trustee, LLC. (Szymczyk, Alyssa)
September 27, 2018 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by ALG Trustee, LLC filed by Sung R. Ahn. (Smith, Juliane)
September 18, 2018 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Chaney, Heather)
September 17, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Clark, Jessica)
September 14, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (klau, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 18 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by ALG Trustee, LLC. (Szymczyk, Alyssa)
September 13, 2018 Filing 17 Notice of Hearing Date re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Szymczyk, Alyssa)
September 13, 2018 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by ALG Trustee, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Szymczyk, Alyssa)
September 13, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by ALG Trustee, LLC. (Szymczyk, Alyssa)
September 10, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sung R. Ahn. (Smith, Juliane)
September 10, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sung R. Ahn. (Smith, Juliane)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan #11 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 5, 2018, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's August 21, 2018 Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court(see order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 08/30/2018. (lgue, )
August 29, 2018 Filing 11 Joint Discovery Plan by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Nationstar Mortgage LLC.(Clark, Jessica)
August 29, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
August 28, 2018 Filing 10 Notice of Hearing Date set for October 5, 2018 re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #9 Memorandum in Support (Chaney, Heather)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Chaney, Heather)
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chaney, Heather)
August 28, 2018 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Hearing Date set for October 5, 2018 re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Clark, Jessica)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Clark, Jessica)
August 27, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Clark, Jessica)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2018 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Discovery due by 1/11/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/21/18. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (rban, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. (rban, )
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fairfax County Circuit Court, case number 2018-10515 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6236895.), filed by Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (No answer filed in state court.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(rban, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahn v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sung R. Ahn
Represented By: Juliane Ylenia Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Heather Britton Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALG Trustee, LLC
Represented By: Alyssa Lynn Szymczyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Jessica Anne Clark
Represented By: Syed Mohsin Reza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Jessica Anne Clark
Represented By: Syed Mohsin Reza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?