Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv01136
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Claude M Hilton
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/19/18. (klau, )
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Expedite Discovery. See Order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 9/12/2018. (rban, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 Waiver of re #6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery of Oral Argument by Malibu Media, LLC (Decker, John)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, John)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon A. Hoppe and Certification of Local Counsel John C. Decker Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6267230. by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John)
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright. (Attachments: #1 Copyright List)(rban, mailed to copyright office)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Malibu Media, LLC. (rban, )
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6262154.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rban, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: John Carlin Decker, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?