Grant v. U.S. Department of Defense

Plaintiff: William Lee Grant, II
Defendant: U.S. Department of Defense
Case Number: 1:2018cv01149
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: Virginia Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
1 Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2018 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #13 Notice of Appeal (acha, )
November 6, 2018 16 Letter from the 4th Circuit requesting the transmittal of the record. (acha, )
November 5, 2018 14 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #13 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (acha, )
November 2, 2018 15 USCA Case Number 18-2331 4th Circuit, M. Radday, Case Manager for #13 Notice of Appeal filed by William Lee Grant, II. (acha, )
November 2, 2018 13 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, by William Lee Grant, II. Filing fee $ 505, not paid. (acha, )
October 24, 2018 12 Featured Case ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion [Dkt. No #11 be and is DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff not file anything further in this action with this Court. Any further communication must be with the court of appeals. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/24/2018. (See order for further details). (acha, ) Copy mailed to Plaintiff Pro-Se.
October 22, 2018 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by William Lee Grant, II. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, )
October 15, 2018 10 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Retransmitted to 4CCA re #5 Notice of Appeal. (rban, )
October 10, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to #5 Notice of Appeal filed by William Lee Grant, II. The court grants appellant leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (acha, )
September 27, 2018 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #5 Notice of Appeal (lcre, )
September 27, 2018 8 Letter from the 4th Circuit requesting the transmittal of the record. (lcre, )
September 27, 2018 7 USCA Case Number 18-2122 4th Circuit Case Manager M. Radday for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by William Lee Grant, II. (lcre, )
September 25, 2018 6 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #5 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (acha, )
September 25, 2018 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order Dismissing Case as Frivolous, by William Lee Grant, II. Filing fee $ 505, not paid. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, )
September 12, 2018 4 RULE 58 JUDGMENT is hereby in favor of the defendant U.S. Department of Defense and against the Plaintiff, William Lee Grant, II. (Entered by Clerk pursuant to FRCP 58. Copy mailed to Plaintiff-Pro Se.
September 12, 2018 3 Featured Case ORDER-It is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's Complaint Dkt. No. #1 be and is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; and it is further ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis Dkt. No. #2 be and is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 9/12/2018. (acha, ) Copy mailed to Plaintiff-Pro Se.
September 10, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Lee Grant, II. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(aott)
September 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT and Exhibits and against U.S. Department of Defense, filed by William Lee Grant, II. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Continued, #2 Complaint Continued, #3 Complaint Continued, #4 Envelope, #5 Envelope)(aott)(unscanned exhibits filed separately in civil vault)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant v. U.S. Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Lee Grant, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?