Munson v. U.S.

Plaintiff: John Munson
Defendant: U.S.
Case Number: 1:2018cv01153
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Deportation
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney served on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (dvanm, )
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/22/2018. (c/s to plaintiff) (dvanm, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Jefferson Sessions by John Munson. (dvanm, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued, via USMS, as to U.S., U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dvanm, )
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Sealed ORDER granting IFP. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 10/02/2018. (c/s to plaintiff)(dvanm, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Electronic Equipment in a Federal Courthouse by John Munson. (dvanm, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Munson. (dvanm, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Discovery by John Munson. (dvanm, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Declaratory or Injunctive Relief by John Munson. (dvanm, )
September 11, 2018 Filing 1 Emergency COMPLAINT against U.S., filed by John Munson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munson v. U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?