Builders Mutual Insurance Company v. Wedge Construction, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Builders Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Wedge Construction, Inc., Robert S. Voss and Martha Voss
Case Number: 1:2018cv01512
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Wedge Construction, Inc..(Stewart, James)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER- ORDERED AND ADJUDGED:1. Defendants Robert S. Voss's and Martha Lynne Crane's Consent Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED;2. Defendant Robert S. Voss and Defendant Martha Lynne Crane (incorrectly identified in the Complaint as "Martha Voss") have until February 8, 2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint [Doc. I]; and 3. Neither party has waived any defenses and/or arguments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 1/10/2019. (dest, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (hearing waived) by Martha Voss, Robert S. Voss. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Ward, Scott)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane U. Montgomery on behalf of Builders Mutual Insurance Company (Montgomery, Diane)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Martha Voss. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Robert S. Voss, Wedge Construction, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dest, )
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel)
December 6, 2018 Notice of Correction re #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that the documents are incorrectly saved PDF fillable form sand has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the documents. (dest, )
December 6, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dest, )
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel) (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/6/2018) (dest, ).
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/6/2018) (dest, ).
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Robey, Daniel)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6394025.), filed by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Robey, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Builders Mutual Insurance Company v. Wedge Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Builders Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel L. Robey
Represented By: Diane U. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wedge Construction, Inc.
Represented By: James Milton Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Voss
Represented By: Scott John Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Voss
Represented By: Scott John Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?