Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2018cv01549
Filed: December 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/3/2019. (aott)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice for Jon Alexander Hoppe. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 12/18/2018. (acha, )
December 16, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (acha, )
December 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding Copyright (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Decker, John)
December 16, 2018 Filing 6 Waiver of re #4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery of Oral Argument by Malibu Media, LLC (Decker, John)
December 16, 2018 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John)
December 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, John) Modified on 1/3/2019 (aott, ).
December 16, 2018 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon A. Hoppe and Certification of Local Counsel John C. Decker, II Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6408853. by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John)
December 16, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John)
December 16, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint for Damages for Property Rights Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6408840.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: John Carlin Decker, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?