Agbapurunowu v. NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC et al
Plaintiff: Fidelis Agbapurunowu
Defendant: NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC and NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv01555
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; The Motion is DENIED with respect to attorneys' fees; and the Motion is otherwise GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 2/1/2019. (dzir)
February 1, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Motion Hearing held on 2/1/2019 re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC, NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC. Counsel appeared for Plaintiff and Defendant. Motion argued and granted in part/denied in part. The Motion is granted to the extent that the complaint is dismissed for failure to state claim. The Motion is denied with respect to attorneys' fees. Order to follow. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir)
January 30, 2019 Filing 22 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by Fidelis Agbapurunowu.(Erlich, Joshua)
January 24, 2019 Filing 21 Declaration re #20 Reply to Response to Motion by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brown, Jay)
January 24, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Brown, Jay)
January 18, 2019 Filing 19 Memorandum in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Fidelis Agbapurunowu. (Herrmann, Katherine)
January 15, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (acha, )
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that #16 Motion to Continue Rule 16 Conference is GRANTED and that the Rule 16 Conference currently scheduled for January 30, 2019, is rescheduled for February 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 1/15/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
January 9, 2019 Filing 17 Waiver of re #16 Consent MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC (Brown, Jay)
January 9, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Conference by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Proposed Order)(Brown, Jay)
January 7, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 2/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 5/10/2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 1/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Hearing Date set for February 1, 2019 re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Brown, Jay)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jay Ward Brown by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Brown, Jay)
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Brown, Jay)
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Brown, Jay)
December 21, 2018 DVD received (placed in file room). (rban, )
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC answer due 1/4/2019; NBCUniversal Media, LLC answer due 1/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 12/20/2018. (dvanm, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Fidelis Agbapurunowu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Erlich, Joshua)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to File Audio/Visual Exhibit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 12/19/2018. (See order for further details). (acha, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 7 Waiver of re #5 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Audio/Visual Exhibit - Waiver of Oral Argument by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC (Brown, Jay)
December 19, 2018 Notice of Correction re #5 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Audio/Visual Exhibit. The filing user has been notified to file a separate Waiver of Oral Argument. (acha, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Service re #5 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Audio/Visual Exhibit, #4 Withdrawal of Motion by Jay Ward Brown on behalf of NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC (Brown, Jay)
December 19, 2018 Notice of Correction re #4 Withdrawal of Motion. The filing user has been notified to file a certificate of service with this filing. (acha, )
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Audio/Visual Exhibit by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, Jay)
December 18, 2018 Filing 4 Withdrawal of Motion by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC re #3 MOTION for Leave to File Audio/Visual Exhibit (Brown, Jay)
December 17, 2018 Notice of Correction re #3 MOTION for Leave to File Audio/Visual Exhibit. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (acha, )
December 17, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (acha, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Audio/Visual Exhibit by NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC, NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Brown, Jay)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NBCUniversal Media, LLC, NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC. (Brown, Jay)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6409289.), filed by NBCUniversal Media, LLC, NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Praecipe, #4 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket, #5 Exhibit 4 - State Court Notice of Filing)(Brown, Jay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agbapurunowu v. NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelis Agbapurunowu
Represented By: Joshua Harry Erlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBC Subsidiary (WRC-TV), LLC
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Represented By: Jay Ward Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?