Synectrust LLC et al v. Camacho et al

Plaintiff: Jack Hirsbrunner and SYNECTRUST LLC
Defendant: Karen Baez and Uruyoan Camacho
Case Number: 1:2018cv01573
Filed: December 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 6/14/2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 2/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Venue & Lack of Minimum Contacts by Uruyoan Camacho. (dvanm, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Karen Baez. (rban, )
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Summons Camacho Summons as served by Jack Hirsbrunner, Synectrust LLC. (Hernandez, Hector) Modified on to correct event 1/18/2019 (dvanm, ).
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Summons Baez Summons as served by Jack Hirsbrunner, Synectrust LLC. (Hernandez, Hector) Modified to correct event on 1/18/2019 (dvanm, ).
December 26, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Karen Baez, Uruyoan Camacho. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dest, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Karen Baez by Jack Hirsbrunner, Synectrust LLC. (Hernandez, Hector)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Urayoan Camacho by Jack Hirsbrunner, Synectrust LLC. (Hernandez, Hector)
December 20, 2018 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm, )
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jane Becker Whitaker and Certification of Local Counsel Hector I. Hernandez, Sr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6418160. by Jack Hirsbrunner, SYNECTRUST LLC. (Hernandez, Hector)
December 20, 2018 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6418132.), filed by SYNECTRUST LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Employment Agreement, #3 Affidavit Statement)(Hernandez, Hector) (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/21/2018) (dvanm, ). Modified to replace cover sheet with non fillable form on 12/21/2018 (dvanm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synectrust LLC et al v. Camacho et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Baez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uruyoan Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Hirsbrunner
Represented By: Hector Ines Hernandez, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYNECTRUST LLC
Represented By: Hector Ines Hernandez, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?