Jones v. State Of Virginia
Plaintiff: W.-Jerimiah: Jones
Defendant: State Of Virginia
Case Number: 1:2018cv01596
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
2 Judge: Ivan D Davis
3 Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that Jones's complaint [Dkt. No. 1] be and is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE ---- (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/22/19. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff on 2/22/19.(klau, )
February 14, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. District Judge Anthony J Trenga, Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis no longer assigned to the case. (rban, )
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to State Of Virginia served on 1/15/2019, answer due 2/5/2019 (Attachments: #1 Letter)(klau, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2019: #2 Envelope) (klau, ).
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to State Of Virginia. (lcre, )(copy mailed to plaintiff pro-se)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Of Virginia ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683076321.), filed by W.-Jerimiah: Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Receipt, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(lcre, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. State Of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.-Jerimiah: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?