Zachariasiewicz v. Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration et al

Plaintiff: Robert F Zachariasiewicz
Defendant: Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration, Matthew Whitaker and U.S. Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2019cv00055
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
0 Judge: John F Anderson
1 Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to: U.S. Department of Justice served on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019; Matthew Whitaker served on 1/22/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (acha, )
January 31, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed G. Zachary Terwilliger, US Attorney-EDVA served on 1/24/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (acha, )
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Robert F Zachariasiewicz of Summonses returned executed as to Matthew Whitaker, U.S. Department of Justice, and G. Zachary Terwilliger (Byrnes, Kevin)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons as to U.S. Department of Justice by Robert F Zachariasiewicz. (Byrnes, Kevin)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Matthew Whitaker, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, ).
January 15, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. The filer has been notified to file the complaint with correct case caption and correct the summonses attached for all listed defendants in the case as proposed summonses. (acha, )
January 11, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (acha, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against U.S. Department of Justice and Matthew Whitaker,(Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6443926.), filed by Robert F Zachariasiewicz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Byrnes, Kevin) Modified on 1/15/2019 to edit the docket text (rban, ). Modified on 1/16/2019 (acha, ) to update payment receipt information.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zachariasiewicz v. Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert F Zachariasiewicz
Represented By: Kevin Edward Byrnes
Represented By: Samuel Mark Adelmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice, Drug Enforcement Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?