Aarow/IET LLC v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company

Plaintiff: United States f/u/b/o Aarow/IET LLC and Aarow/IET LLC
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Intervenor Defendant: Harper Construction Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00085
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3133
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 18 Memorandum in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Aarow/IET LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edelstein, David)
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by Harper Construction Company, Inc..(Grossman, David)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice for Michael McNamara. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/12/2019. (acha, )
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael McNamara and Certification of Local Counsel David Charles Grossman Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6530813. by Harper Construction Company, Inc.. (Grossman, David)
March 7, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harper Construction Company, Inc.. (Grossman, David)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that Harper's #11 Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 3/6/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 7/12/2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 3/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION to Intervene by Harper Construction Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grossman, David)
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (DeVan, William)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Hearing Date March 29, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #8 Memorandum in Support (DeVan, William)
March 6, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (DeVan, William)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (DeVan, William)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 2/12/2019. (rban, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam C. Harrison and Certification of Local Counsel David A. Edelstein Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6482483. by Aarow/IET LLC. (Edelstein, David)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
January 23, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (acha, )
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint (to Hartford Fire Insurance Company) by Aarow/IET LLC United States for the Use and Benefit of. (Edelstein, David) Modified on 1/24/2019 to correct text(acha, ).
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Aarow/IET LLC United States for the Use and Benefit of. (Edelstein, David) Modified on 1/24/2019 to correct text(acha, ).
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6458847.), filed by Aarow/IET LLC United States for the Use and Benefit of. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelstein, David) (Attachment 4 Civil Cover Sheet replaced on 1/24/2019 as the document was fillable) (acha, ). Title corrected and Modified on 1/24/2019 (acha, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aarow/IET LLC v. Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States f/u/b/o Aarow/IET LLC
Represented By: David A. Edelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aarow/IET LLC
Represented By: David A. Edelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: William Arthur DeVan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Harper Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: David Charles Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?