CX Solutions, Inc. vs. The American Automobile Association, Inc.

Plaintiff: CX Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: American Automobile Association, Inc. and The American Automobile Association, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00132
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
0 Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
1 Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 So Ordered re #12 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/19/2019. (aott)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by CX Solutions, Inc.. (Jacobs, Jonathan)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice for Matthew Paul Vafidis. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/7/2019. (dest, )
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Discovery due by 7/12/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Paul Vafidis and Certification of Local Counsel Robert Joseph Farlow Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6523961. by The American Automobile Association, Inc.. (Farlow, Robert)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The American Automobile Association, Inc.. (Farlow, Robert)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by The American Automobile Association, Inc..(Farlow, Robert)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to The American Automobile Association, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dest, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by CX Solutions, Inc.. (Jacobs, Jonathan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to The American Automobile Association, Inc. (Jacobs, Jonathan) Modified on 2/11/2019 to correct docket event (dest, ).
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The American Automobile Association, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dest, )
February 4, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dest, )
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by CX Solutions, Inc.. (Jacobs, Jonathan)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6477416.), filed by CX Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jacobs, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CX Solutions, Inc. vs. The American Automobile Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Automobile Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American Automobile Association, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Joseph Farlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CX Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Spencer Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?