Howarth v. GMH Mortgage Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Morgan Howarth
Defendant: GMH Mortgage Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00160
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
0 Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
1 Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 Final Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding copyright VA 1-957-815. (dest, ) (c/s) (dest, ).
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 So Ordered re #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Morgan Howarth. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 4/3/2019. (dest, )
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Morgan Howarth (Deal, David)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Before the Court is the Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Complaint [Dkt. No. 6]. The parties have advised the Court that they have agreed in principle to settle this case and believe that extending defendant GMH Mortgage Services, LLC's ("GMH") current response deadline of March 15, 2019 by 30 days to April 15, 2019 would provide sufficient time to finalize the terms of the settlement. Good cause having been shown, the parties' Joint Motion is GRANTED, and it is hereby ORDERED that defendant GMH move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by April 15,2019.Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/13/19. (yguy)
March 13, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Morgan Howarth. (Deal, David)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to GMH Mortgage Services, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (rban, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Morgan Howarth (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Deal, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Morgan Howarth. (Deal, David)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding copyright. Copy mailed to U.S. Copyright Office. (klau, )
February 11, 2019 Notice of Correction re [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet and [1-2] Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that Civil Cover Sheet and proposed summons is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the documents. (klau, ) Modified text on 2/11/2019 (klau, ).
February 8, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against GMH Mortgage Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6485738.), filed by Morgan Howarth. (Attachments: #1Document filed in error and removed re Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Document filed in error and removed re Proposed Summons)(Deal, David) Modified on 2/8/2019 (klau, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/11/2019) (klau, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/11/2019) (klau, ). Modified text on 2/11/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howarth v. GMH Mortgage Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMH Mortgage Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Howarth
Represented By: David Christopher Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?