Acosta v. Mejia Corporation et al
Plaintiff: United States Department Of Labor and R. Alexander Acosta
Defendant: Mejia Corporation, Armando Mejia, Gloria Mejia and Cesar Mejia
Case Number: 1:2019cv00166
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Nadya Maldonado and Certification of Local Counsel Michael E. Veve Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6587175. by Mejia Corporation. (Veve, Michael)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Mejia Corporation.(Veve, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE/Waiver of Service Returned Executed as to Armando Mejia, Cesar Mejia, Gloria Mejia, Mejia Corporation, waiver sent on 2/13/19, answer due 4/15/19 , by R. Alexander Acosta Defendants Mejia Corporation, et. all Waivers of the Service of Summons (Lewis, Ryma) Modified text on 3/14/2019 (klau, ).
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Avni Amin. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 2/13/2019. (aott)
February 12, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Avni Amin and Certification of Local Counsel Ryma Lewis by United States Department Of Labor. (Lewis, Ryma)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Mejia Corporation, Armando Mejia, Gloria Mejia and Cesar Mejia , filed by United States Department Of Labor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, Ryma) Modified text on 2/12/2019 to add defendant parties (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta v. Mejia Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Department Of Labor
Represented By: Ryma Naje Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Alexander Acosta
Represented By: Ryma Naje Lewis
Represented By: Avni Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mejia Corporation
Represented By: Michael Edward Veve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?