Procon, LLC v. Fulton Bank, NA

Plaintiff: Procon, LLC
Defendant: Fulton Bank, NA
Case Number: 1:2019cv00185
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3133
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Procon, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 4/9/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
April 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Procon, LLC re #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Waiver of Oral Argument (Kay, Douglas)
April 9, 2019 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Procon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Kay, Douglas)
April 1, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Hearing Date set for May 17, 2019 re #15 Memorandum in Support, #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Gary, Brent)
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Fulton Bank, NA. (Gary, Brent)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Fulton Bank, NA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gary, Brent)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice for Akin Alcitepe. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 3/26/2019. (acha, )
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Akin Alcitepe and Certification of Local Counsel Douglas R. Kay Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6557444. by Procon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kay, Douglas)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action and Notice served on Michael Paulson on February 26, 2019, filed by Procon, LLC. (Kay, Douglas)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fulton Bank, NA answer due 3/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 3/18/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Daniel deBettencourt on behalf of Fulton Bank, NA (deBettencourt, Justin)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 Waiver of re #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Oral Argument by Fulton Bank, NA (Gary, Brent)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Fulton Bank, NA. (Gary, Brent)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent Ryan Gary on behalf of Fulton Bank, NA (Gary, Brent)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Fulton Bank, NA. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Procon, LLC. (Kay, Douglas)
February 14, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (acha, )
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Procon, LLC. (Kay, Douglas)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Procon, LLC. (Kay, Douglas)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6495606.), filed by Procon, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Kay, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Procon, LLC v. Fulton Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton Bank, NA
Represented By: Justin Daniel deBettencourt
Represented By: Brent Ryan Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Procon, LLC
Represented By: Douglas R. Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?