Downey v. Commonwealth of Virginia et al
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Defendant: Arlington County, Virginia, Michelle Nuneville, Mary Jane Major, Steven MacIsaac, Chief Farr, Commonwealth of Virginia, Belfor USA Group Inc. and Belfor Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00197
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that Pltf's Amended Complaint is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and this civil action is hereby TERMINATED (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 03/26/19. (c/s: pltf)(pmil, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing on #13 MOTIONS to Quash, to Accommodate the Disabled, to Expedite, to Seal, and to Limit Counsel Due to Conspiracy: Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (pmil, )
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Quash Sovereign Immunity, to Accommodate the Disabled, to Expedite, to Seal, and to Limit Counsel Due to Conspiracy by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(pmil, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing on #10 MOTION to Seal and #11 MOTION to Limit Counsel Due to Conspiracy: Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (pmil, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Limit Counsel Due to Conspiracy by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pmil, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Expedite and Seal by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pmil, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arlington County, Virginia, Commonwealth of Virginia, Chief Farr, Steven MacIsaac, Mary Jane Major, Michelle Nuneville, Belfor Holdings, Inc. filed by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pmil, )
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that pltf's #6 Motion to Expedite, to Seal, and to Limit Counsel Due to Conspiracy are DENIED as moot and there will not be a hearing on 03/22/19. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 02/26/19. (pmil, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing on #6 MOTION to Expedite, to Seal, and to Limit Counsel Due to Conspiracy : Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pmil, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite, to Seal, and to Limit Counsel Due to Conspiracy by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(pmil, )
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Pltf's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED ; Pltf's Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE . Pltf will have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to file an Amended Complaint; Pltf's #3 Motion to Expedite, Motion to Seal and Motion to Limit Counsel Due to Conspiracy are DENIED as moot (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 02/25/19. (Copy mailed to pltf) (pmil, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions #3 MOTION to Expedite, to Seal and to Limit Counsel Due to Conspiracy : Motion Hearing set for 3/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (pmil, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite, to Seal and to Limit Counsel Due to Conspiracy by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 83.1 Certification)(pmil, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION/MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark Downey. (pmil, )
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arlington County, Virginia, Belfor USA Group Inc., Commonwealth of Virginia, Chief Farr, Steven MacIsaac, Mary Jane Major, Michelle Nuneville administratively filed by Mark Downey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 83.1 Certification)(pmil, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downey v. Commonwealth of Virginia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlington County, Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Nuneville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jane Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven MacIsaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belfor USA Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belfor Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?