JBL System Solutions, LLC et al v. Williams, et al.
Plaintiff: Brenda Lazzari, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Joseph Paul Lazzari, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller and Judith Gordon
Defendant: Defense Logistics Agency, Department Of Defense, Lt. Gen. Darrell K Williams, Secretary Patrick M. Shanahan, U.S. Department of Defense, Darrell K. Williams, Patrick M. Shanahan, U.S. Defense Logistics Agency and Melinda L. Perritano
Case Number: 1:2019cv00226
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 So Ordered re #48 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice, filed by Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC, Joseph P. Lazzari, Judith Gordon, Brenda Lazzari, JBL System Solutions, LLC. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/27/19. (klau, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 8/9/2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 3/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER that Plaintiffs' #30 Emergency Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction be, and the same hereby is, DENIED (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/22/19. (klau, )
March 15, 2019 Filing 45 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Motion Hearing held on 3/15/2019 re #30 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended filed by Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC, Joseph P. Lazzari, Judith Gordon, Brenda Lazzari, JBL System Solutions, LLC. Counsel appeared for Plaintiff and Defendant. Motion argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Rebecca Monroe(Casamo))(dzir)
March 14, 2019 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended filed by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 13, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #30 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended filed by Melinda L. Perritano, Patrick M. Shanahan, U.S. Defense Logistics Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, Darrell K. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Spavins, Elizabeth)
March 11, 2019 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT/Summons Returned Executed for Amended Complaint as to U.S. Attorney, served on 3/7/19, answer due 5/6/19 re #34 Summons Issued as to USA, of Process Server as to U.S. Attorney (EDVA) by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Gorton, Lyndsay) Modified text on 3/12/2019 (klau, ).
March 11, 2019 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT re #34 Summons Issued as to USA, of Process Server as to U.S. Attorney General by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 11, 2019 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT re #34 Summons Issued as to USA, of Process Server as to Patrick M. Shanahan (DOD) by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 11, 2019 Filing 39 AFFIDAVIT re #34 Summons Issued as to USA, of Process Server as to U.S. Department of Defense by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 11, 2019 Filing 38 AFFIDAVIT re #34 Summons Issued as to USA, of Process Server as to Melinda Perritano (DLA) by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 11, 2019 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT re #34 Summons Issued as to USA, of Process Server as to Lt. Gen. Darrell Williams (DLA) by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 11, 2019 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT re #34 Summons Issued as to USA, of Process Server as to United States Defense Logistics Agency by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 8, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by David William O'Brien on behalf of Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC (O'Brien, David)
March 6, 2019 Filing 34 Summons Issued for Amended Complaint for service by SPS as to Melinda L. Perritano, Patrick M. Shanahan, U.S. Defense Logistics Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, Darrell K. Williams, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
March 5, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #30 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended. Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2019 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (klau, )
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that the hearing on Plaintiffs' #30 Emergency Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, currently scheduled for Monday, March 11, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. be, and the same hereby is, CONTINUED to Friday, March 15, 2019 at 2:00 p.m.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/5/19. (klau, )
March 5, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #30 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
March 4, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Hearing Date March 11, 2019 re #30 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 4, 2019 Filing 31 Memorandum in Support re #30 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended filed by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lyndsay Gorton, #2 Exhibit 1 to Gorton Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Gorton Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Gorton Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Gorton Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Gorton Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Gorton Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Gorton Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Gorton Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Gorton Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Gorton Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Gorton Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Gorton Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Gorton Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 to Gorton Declaration)(Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 4, 2019 Filing 30 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 4, 2019 Filing 29 Proposed Summons as to Patrick M. Shanahan by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 4, 2019 Filing 28 Proposed Summons as to Melinda L. Perritano by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 4, 2019 Filing 27 Proposed Summons as to Lt. Gen. Darrell K. Williams by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 4, 2019 Filing 26 Proposed Summons as to G. Zachary Terwilliger (USAO EDVA) by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 4, 2019 Filing 25 Proposed Summons as to William P. Barr (United States Department of Justice) by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 4, 2019 Filing 24 Proposed Summons as to United States Department of Defense by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 4, 2019 Filing 23 Proposed Summons as to United States Defense Logistics Agency by Judith Gordon, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, Lisa Miller, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 4, 2019 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against Patrick M. Shanahan, U.S. Defense Logistics Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, Darrell K. Williams, Melinda L. Perritano, filed by Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari, JBL System Solutions, LLC, Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC, Judith Gordon, Lisa Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/4/19. (klau, )
March 4, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 3/15/2019 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (klau, )
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that the hearing on Plaintiffs' #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, currently scheduled for Friday, March 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. be, and the same hereby is, CONTINUED to Friday, March 15, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/4/19. (klau, )
March 1, 2019 Filing 19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David B. Robbins and Certification of Local Counsel Lyndsay A. Gorton Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6518640. by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
March 1, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT/Summons returned executed as to Darrell Williams re #12 Summons Issued as to USA, of Process Server by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari. (Gorton, Lyndsay) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (klau, ).
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT/Summons returned executed as to Patrick Shanahan re #12 Summons Issued as to USA, of Process Server by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari. (Gorton, Lyndsay) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (klau, ).
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT/Summons returned executed as to U.S. Attorney served on 2/28/19, answer due 4/29/19 re #12 Summons Issued as to USA, of Process Server by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari. (Gorton, Lyndsay) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (klau, ).
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT/Summons returned executed as to U.S. Attorney General re #12 Summons Issued as to USA, of Process Server by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari. (Gorton, Lyndsay) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (klau, ).
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT/Summons returned executed as to United States Department of Defense re #12 Summons Issued as to USA, of Process Server by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari. (Gorton, Lyndsay) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (klau, ).
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT/Summons returned executed as to United States Defense Logistics Agency re #12 Summons Issued as to USA, of Process Server by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari. (Gorton, Lyndsay) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (klau, ).
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Patrick M. Shanahan, U.S. Defense Logistics Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, Darrell K. Williams, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons William P. Barr by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons G. Zachary Terwilliger by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
February 27, 2019 Notice of Correction re #7 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified to file a proposed summons as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (klau, )
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons Lt. Gen. Darrell K. Williams by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons Patrick M. Shanahan by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons United States Department of Defense by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons United States Defense Logistics Agenc by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
February 26, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 3/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
February 26, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Hearing Date re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Gorton, Lyndsay)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph Paul Lazzari. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Lyndsay Gorton, #2 Exhibit 1 to Gorton Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Gorton Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Gorton Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Gorton Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Gorton Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Gorton Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Gorton Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Gorton Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Gorton Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Gorton Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Gorton Declaration)(Gorton, Lyndsay)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph Paul Lazzari. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gorton, Lyndsay)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JBL System Solutions, LLC. (Gorton, Lyndsay)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Darrell K. Williams, U.S. Defense Logistics Agency, Patrick M. Shanahan and U.S. Department of Defense ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6508689.), filed by JBL System Solutions, LLC, Brenda Lazzari, Joseph P. Lazzari. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5 to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #7 Exhibit Ex. 6 to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #8 Exhibit Ex. 7 to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #9 Exhibit Ex. 8 to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #10 Exhibit Ex. 9 to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #11 Exhibit Ex. 10 to Plaintiffs' Complaint)(Gorton, Lyndsay) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JBL System Solutions, LLC et al v. Williams, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Logistics Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department Of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Gen. Darrell K Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Patrick M. Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Defense
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell K. Williams
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick M. Shanahan
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Defense Logistics Agency
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda L. Perritano
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lazzari
Represented By: Lyndsay Amelia Gorton
Represented By: David William O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JBL System Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Lyndsay Amelia Gorton
Represented By: David William O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Paul Lazzari
Represented By: Lyndsay Amelia Gorton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Potomac Military Manufacturing LLC
Represented By: Lyndsay Amelia Gorton
Represented By: David William O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph P. Lazzari
Represented By: Lyndsay Amelia Gorton
Represented By: David William O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Miller
Represented By: Lyndsay Amelia Gorton
Represented By: David William O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Gordon
Represented By: Lyndsay Amelia Gorton
Represented By: David William O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?