Molina et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Melisandra Marrero and Armando Molina
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and Professional Foreclosure Corporation of Virginia
Case Number: 1:2019cv00263
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER - This matter comes before this Court on Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4l(a)(l)(A)(i), a plaintiff may dismiss an action by filing a notice of dismissal before the opposing party serves either an answer or a motion for summary judgment pursuant to FRCP 56. No answer or motion for summary Judgment has been filed.Accordingly, this matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 4/30/2019. (dvanm, )
April 29, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Melisandra Marrero, Armando Molina (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parikh, Shikha)
April 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Shikha Darpan Parikh on behalf of Melisandra Marrero, Armando Molina (Parikh, Shikha)
April 1, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Hearing Date re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Gartner, Thomas)
March 25, 2019 Notice of Correction re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date. (dvanm, )
March 25, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Hearing Date re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Reza, Syed)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Reza, Syed)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Professional Foreclosure Corporation of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gartner, Thomas)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Professional Foreclosure Corporation of Virginia. (Gartner, Thomas)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 3/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 3/12/2019. (dvanm, )
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, by Professional Foreclosure Corporation of Virginia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gartner, Thomas)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 3/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 3/7/2019. (dvanm, )
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of re #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint - Waiver of Oral Argument by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Reza, Syed)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed)
March 6, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (aott)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Reza, Syed)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Reza, Syed)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Reza, Syed)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6524878.), filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Nationstar Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Process, #4 Exhibit C- State Court Notice of Filing Removal, #5 Exhibit D - Consent to Removal)(Reza, Syed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molina et al v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Syed Mohsin Reza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Syed Mohsin Reza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Syed Mohsin Reza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Foreclosure Corporation of Virginia
Represented By: Thomas John Gartner
Represented By: William Mapp Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melisandra Marrero
Represented By: Juliane Ylenia Smith
Represented By: Shikha Darpan Parikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Molina
Represented By: Juliane Ylenia Smith
Represented By: Shikha Darpan Parikh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?