Brown v. Shanahan
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Bernard Brown
Defendant: Patrick Michael Shanahan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00552
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2019 Filing 25 Acknowledgment of Receipt. (rban, )
May 7, 2019 Filing 24 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 8:19-cv-00210. Original file and docket sheet received.
May 6, 2019 Filing 22 ***DOCUMENT MAILED #21 Order adopting Report and Recommendation along with address for the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia, placed in U.S. Mail to Lorenzo Bernard Brown (kmca) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/7/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER adopting #15 Report and Recommendation. This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Honorable Timothy M Cain on 5/6/19. (kmca) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/7/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 20 ***DOCUMENT MAILED INTERNATIONAL FIRST CLASS: 19 Order, placed in U.S. Mail to Lorenzo Bernard Brown (kmca) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/7/2019.]
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER giving Pro Se Plaintiff twenty-one (21) days for mail time because listed address is a military base in Japan. Objections to #15 R&R due by 4/30/2019. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Timothy M Cain on 4/1/19. (kmca) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/7/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 18 ***DOCUMENT MAILED INTERNATIONAL FIRST CLASS 17 Transfer of Case Management placed in U.S. Mail to Lorenzo Bernard Brown (gpre, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/7/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 17 ***CASE MANAGEMENT TRANSFERRED to civil case manager for Judge Timothy M. Cain. Any future filings must be sent to the Clerk's Office at the following address: 300 East Washington Street, Greenville South Carolina, 29601. (gpre, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/7/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 ***DOCUMENT MAILED INTERNATIONAL FIRST CLASS #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail to Lorenzo Bernard Brown (gpre, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/7/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommends that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. Objections to R&R due by 4/12/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 3/29/2019. (gpre, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/7/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWERS TO COURT'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES by Lorenzo Bernard Brown.(gpre, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/7/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 Pro Se Party's Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Lorenzo Bernard Brown.(gpre, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/7/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 ***DOCUMENT MAILED INTERNATIONAL FIRST CLASS #5 Proper Form Order, Pro Se Interrogatories, Court's Special Interrogatories, Summons forms (3), placed in U.S. Mail to Lorenzo Bernard Brown (gpre, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/7/2019.]
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPER FORM ORDER directing Plaintiff to notify the clerk in writing of any change of address. Filing fee paid $400 (receipt number SCX300080000). Case to be brought into proper form within twenty-one (21) days from the date this Order is entered (plus twenty-one (21) days for mail time.) Accordingly the proper form deadline is March 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacquelyn D Austin on 2/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Rule 26.01 Interrogatories, #2 Court's Special Interrogatories)(gpre, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/7/2019.]
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Patrick Michael Shanahan ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX300080000.), filed by Lorenzo Bernard Brown. Service due by 4/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Report of Investigation, #2 Exhibit B-Fujie Emails, #3 Exhibit C-Communication, #4 Exhibit D-Performance Notification Response, #5 Exhibit E-PIP Meeting 5 Jan 2012, #6 Exhibit F-OFO Decision, #7 Exhibit G-OFO Decision, #8 Exhibit H- PM Letter of Reprimand, #9 Envelope)(gpre, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 5/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Michael Shanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Bernard Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?