Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. Janssen Biotech, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Defendant: Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC and BTG International Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00605
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: For the reasons stated in open court, plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Cases [Dkt. No. 3] is GRANTED; plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Interim Counsel for the Proposed Class [Dkt. No. 5] and defendants' Consent Motion to Set Date [Dkt. No. 20] are DEFERRED to the transferee court; and it is hereby ORDERED that this civil action be and is CONSOLIDATED with civil action 1:19-cv-474. (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/21/19. (yguy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Motion Hearing held on 6/21/2019. Appearances of counsel. Motions argued. #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases is GRANTED. #5 MOTION For Appointment of Interim Counsel for the Proposed Class and #20 Consent MOTION to set date for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Hearing on Motion to Dismiss are DEFERRED. (order to follow) (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION to set date for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Hearing on Motion to Dismiss by Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Todd, Gordon)
June 13, 2019 Filing 19 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC. (Todd, Gordon)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice for Sharon Robertson. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/11/2019. (acha, )
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice for Royce Zeisler. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/11/2019. (acha, )
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice for Donna Evans. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/11/2019. (acha, )
June 10, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sharon Robertson and Certification of Local Counsel William H. Monroe, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6683491. by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Monroe, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Royce Zeisler and Certification of Local Counsel William H. Monroe, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6683488. by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Monroe, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Donna Evans and Certification of Local Counsel William H. Monroe, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6683487. by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Monroe, William)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by BTG International Ltd., Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC. (Todd, Gordon)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gordon Dwyer Todd on behalf of Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC (Todd, Gordon)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Ann Leaman on behalf of Janssen Biotech, Inc., Janssen Oncology, Inc., Janssen Research & Development, LLC (Leaman, Kimberly)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. BTG International Ltd. waiver sent on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Monroe, William)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. Janssen Biotech, Inc. waiver sent on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019; Janssen Oncology, Inc. waiver sent on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019; Janssen Research & Development, LLC waiver sent on 5/31/2019, answer due 7/30/2019. (Monroe, William)
June 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #5 MOTION For Appointment of Interim Counsel for the Proposed Class . Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (aott, )
June 3, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. District Judge T. S. Ellis, III no longer assigned to the case. (aott, )
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Hearing Date set for June 21, 2019 re #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases , #5 MOTION For Appointment of Interim Counsel for the Proposed Class (Monroe, William)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION For Appointment of Interim Counsel for the Proposed Class filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Hagens Berman Resume, #2 Exhibit B. Dugan CV, #3 Exhibit C. Robertson Booklet, #4 Exhibit D. KTMC Resume, #5 Exhibit E. BSJ Resume)(Monroe, William)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION For Appointment of Interim Counsel for the Proposed Class by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Monroe, William)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Monroe, William)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Monroe, William)
May 16, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (acha, )
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Monroe, William)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6644761.), filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Monroe, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore v. Janssen Biotech, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Biotech, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Leaman
Represented By: Gordon Dwyer Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Oncology, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Leaman
Represented By: Gordon Dwyer Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Research & Development, LLC
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Leaman
Represented By: Gordon Dwyer Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTG International Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Represented By: William Hanes Monroe, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?