Thomas v. Aetna Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Robin Thomas
Defendant: Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan and Aetna Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00611
Filed: May 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Griffin, Frank)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Griffin, Frank)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Hastings Griffin, IV on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company (Griffin, Frank)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Substitute Party. Aetna Life Insurance Company added. Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 7/2/2019. (dvanm, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Substitute Party by Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan. (Murdock, John)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan answer due 7/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 6/18/2019. (aott)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Murdock, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
May 18, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (dvanm, )
May 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Robin Thomas. (Glass, Benjamin)
May 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6647553.), filed by Robin Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Glass, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Thomas
Represented By: Benjamin Weaver Glass, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc. Long Term Disability Plan
Represented By: John Mark Murdock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Frank Hastings Griffin, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?