Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00621
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: T S Ellis
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 6/19/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 05/23/2019. (dvanm, )
May 21, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, )
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon A. Hoppe and Certification of Local Counsel John C. Decker Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6652374. by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright filed. by Malibu Media, LLC (Decker, John) Modified on 5/22/2019 (dvanm, ). (c/s to copyright office 5/22/19)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of re #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, #4 Memorandum in Support of Oral Argument by Malibu Media, LLC (Decker, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint Action for Damages for Property Rights Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6652330.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: John Carlin Decker, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?