Dao et al v. Faustin et al
Plaintiff: Sophia Khan and Melaney Dao
Defendant: Paul M. Faustin and Infused Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00649
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/8/2019. (rban, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Melaney Dao, Sophia Khan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chen, Hans)
July 3, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (dvanm, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 21 Notice of Hearing Date set for August 16, 2019 re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Radcliffe, Michelle)
July 2, 2019 Filing 20 Memorandum in Support re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Infused Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Radcliffe, Michelle)
July 2, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Infused Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Radcliffe, Michelle)
July 2, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Hearing Date set for August 16, 2019 re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Grant, Gregory)
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Paul M. Faustin. (Grant, Gregory)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Paul M. Faustin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Grant, Gregory)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Hans Harris Chen on behalf of Melaney Dao, Sophia Khan (Chen, Hans)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that the #11 Consent Motion is GRANTED; and it FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is deemed filed as of the date of this Consent Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 6/11/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
June 11, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings Second Amended Complaint and Responses due by 7/2/2019. (acha, )
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Sophia Khan, Melaney Dao. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 6/11/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of re #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Waiver of Oral Argument by Infused Solutions, LLC (Radcliffe, Michelle)
June 3, 2019 Notice of Correction re #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Waiver of Oral Argument. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (acha, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Waiver of Oral Argument by Paul M. Faustin, Infused Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Radcliffe, Michelle)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of re #8 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Melaney Dao, Sophia Khan (Cohen, Peter)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants, filed by Melaney Dao, Sophia Khan.(Cohen, Peter)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Melaney Dao, Sophia Khan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Peter)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint and Extension of Time for Defendants to File Any Required Response Thereto by Melaney Dao, Sophia Khan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cohen, Peter)
May 28, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (acha, )
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Paul M. Faustin re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Joinder & Consent to Removal (Grant, Gregory)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory David Grant on behalf of Paul M. Faustin (Grant, Gregory)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Lee Isler on behalf of Infused Solutions, LLC (Isler, Edward)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Infused Solutions, LLC. (Radcliffe, Michelle)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Bodley Radcliffe on behalf of Infused Solutions, LLC (Radcliffe, Michelle)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6660446.), filed by Infused Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Infused Solutions Summons and Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Paul Faustin Summons, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Parties, #5 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State, #6 Exhibit Other State Court Documents, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Radcliffe, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dao et al v. Faustin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Khan
Represented By: Hans Harris Chen
Represented By: Peter Charles Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melaney Dao
Represented By: Hans Harris Chen
Represented By: Peter Charles Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul M. Faustin
Represented By: Gregory David Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infused Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Michelle Bodley Radcliffe
Represented By: Edward Lee Isler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?