Forness v. Masterpiece International Limited, LLC
Plaintiff: Candace Forness
Defendant: Masterpiece International Limited, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00703
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 So Ordered re #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Candace Forness. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 07/17/2019. (dvanm, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Candace Forness (Sutter, Matthew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Masterpiece International Limited, LLC of Settlement (Greener, Joseph)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariana D. Bravo on behalf of Masterpiece International Limited, LLC (Bravo, Mariana)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . ORDERED that the period in which Defendant is to file a responsive pleading is enlarged to July 3, 2019. No further extensions will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 06/18/2019. (wgar, )
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of re #5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Oral Argument by Masterpiece International Limited, LLC (Greener, Joseph)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Masterpiece International Limited, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greener, Joseph)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that the period in which Defendant is to file a responsive pleading is enlarged to June 20, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 06/06/2019. (wgar, )
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Waiver of re #2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Responsive Pleading Oral Argument by Masterpiece International Limited, LLC (Greener, Joseph)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Responsive Pleading by Masterpiece International Limited, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greener, Joseph)
May 30, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm, )
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6666584.), filed by Masterpiece International Limited, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Greener, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Forness v. Masterpiece International Limited, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masterpiece International Limited, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Boyd Greener
Represented By: Mariana D. Bravo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Forness
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Sutter
Represented By: Gregg Cohen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?