MOLAND v. EXPLOSIVE COUNTERMEASURES INTERNATIONAL, INC., et al
Plaintiff: William Moland
Defendant: Megan Kelley and Explosive Countermeasures International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00710
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Substitution of Counsel of Joseph Greener by Ryan Michael Poteet on behalf of Explosive Countermeasures International, Inc., Megan Kelley (Poteet, Ryan)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED that the Court will stay until July 8, 2019 issuance of a scheduling order, which will start discovery. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/24/2019. (lcre, )(c/s to Plaintiff's attorney of record)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Explosive Countermeasures International, Inc., Megan Kelley.(Calamis, Nat)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Megan Kelley, Explosive Countermeasures International, Inc.. (Calamis, Nat)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 6/14/2019. (rban, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension to File Responsive Pleading by Explosive Countermeasures International, Inc., Megan Kelley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Greener, Joseph)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 Letter to the Court by William Moland. (klau, )
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:18-cv-02263. Original file and docket sheet received.
May 31, 2019 Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Virginia, pursuant to the Court Order entered 5/21/19. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/3/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting #3 motion to transfer case: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/21/19. (lcrc1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/3/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 motion to transfer case: See document for details. Transfer due by 5/31/2019. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/21/19. (lcrc1) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/3/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph B. Greener on behalf of EXPLOSIVE COUNTERMEASURES INTERNATIONAL, INC., MEGAN KELLEY (Greener, Joseph) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/3/2019.]
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 REPLY to opposition to motion re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by EXPLOSIVE COUNTERMEASURES INTERNATIONAL, INC., MEGAN KELLEY. (Calamis, Nat) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/3/2019.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by WILLIAM MOLAND. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Markovitz, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/3/2019.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing for Motion to Transfer Venue by EXPLOSIVE COUNTERMEASURES INTERNATIONAL, INC., MEGAN KELLEY re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case (Calamis, Nat) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/3/2019.]
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Case by EXPLOSIVE COUNTERMEASURES INTERNATIONAL, INC., MEGAN KELLEY (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Calamis, Nat) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/3/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to EXPLOSIVE COUNTERMEASURES INTERNATIONAL, INC., MEGAN KELLEY. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/3/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zrdj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/3/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5712439) filed by William Moland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons ECI, #3 Summons Megan Kelley)(Markovitz, Brian) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOLAND v. EXPLOSIVE COUNTERMEASURES INTERNATIONAL, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Kelley
Represented By: Joseph Boyd Greener
Represented By: Nat Peter Calamis
Represented By: Ryan Michael Poteet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Explosive Countermeasures International, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Boyd Greener
Represented By: Nat Peter Calamis
Represented By: Ryan Michael Poteet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Moland
Represented By: Brian Joseph Markovitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?