Sanders v. Bernhardt
Plaintiff: Kaptoria L. Sanders
Defendant: Ryan Zinke and David Bernhardt
Case Number: 1:2019cv00712
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaptoria L. Sanders (Miles, Monique)
July 22, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaptoria L. Sanders David Bernhardt served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019 (Miles, Monique)
July 15, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kaptoria L. Sanders David Bernhardt served on 7/10/2019, answer due 7/31/2019 (Miles, Monique)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued, #2 Summons issued, #3 Notice to Attorney)(aott)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons re #7 Amended Complaint by Kaptoria L. Sanders. (Miles, Monique)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Summons re #7 Amended Complaint by Kaptoria L. Sanders. (Miles, Monique)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons re #7 Amended Complaint by Kaptoria L. Sanders. (Miles, Monique)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kaptoria L. Sanders as to Ryan Zinke. (Miles, Monique)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kaptoria L. Sanders as to Ryan Zinke. (Miles, Monique)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Kaptoria L. Sanders as to Ryan Zinke. (Miles, Monique)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against DAVID BERNHARDT, filed by Kaptoria L. Sanders, DAVID BERNHARDT.(Miles, Monique)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ryan Zinke, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued, #2 Summons issued, #3 Notice to Attorney)(aott, )
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Kaptoria L. Sanders. (Miles, Monique)
June 4, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott, )
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Kaptoria L. Sanders. (Miles, Monique)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Kaptoria L. Sanders. (Miles, Monique)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint by Kaptoria L. Sanders. (Miles, Monique)
June 4, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. The filer has been notified and requested to file a Civil Cover Sheet for this case. (aott)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6671716.), filed by Kaptoria L. Sanders.(Miles, Monique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaptoria L. Sanders
Represented By: Monique Antonia Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?