Agarwal v. Pocasangre
Plaintiff: Sanjay Agarwal
Defendant: Irving Pocasangre
Counter Defendant: Department of Housing and Urban Development, Freedom Mortgage, HUD and Bayview Loan Servicing
Counter Plaintiff: Bessy Pocasangre
Case Number: 1:2019cv00721
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(rban, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 COUNTERCLAIM against Sanjay Agarwal, Bayview Loan Servicing, Department of Housing and Urban Development, Freedom Mortgage, filed by Bessy Pocasangre, Irving Pocasangre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Rule 83.1)(dvanm, )
July 9, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the alternative motion to remand with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 8/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE - Pursuant to the Local Rules of this Court and the E-Filing Policies and Procedures manual, electronic case filing is mandatory;therefore, paper documents (Exhibits for Summary Judgment) were returned to Plaintiff's counsel Alan Cilman. (Notified counsel to pick up at the clerk's office) (klau, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Hearing Date August 9, 2019 re #5 Affidavit, #4 Memorandum in Support, #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the alternative motion to remand with Roseboro,. (Cilman, Alan)
July 8, 2019 Notice of Correction re #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the alternative motion to remand with Roseboro,. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm, )
July 7, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT re #4 Memorandum in Support, #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the alternative motion to remand with Roseboro,. by Sanjay Agarwal. (Cilman, Alan)
July 7, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the alternative motion to remand with Roseboro,. filed by Sanjay Agarwal. (Cilman, Alan)
July 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the alternative motion to remand with Roseboro,. by Sanjay Agarwal. (Cilman, Alan)
July 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Jay Cilman on behalf of Sanjay Agarwal (Cilman, Alan)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fairfax County General District Court, case number GV19012659-00 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683079036.), filed by Irving Pocasangre. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(dvanm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agarwal v. Pocasangre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanjay Agarwal
Represented By: Alan Jay Cilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irving Pocasangre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Department of Housing and Urban Development
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Freedom Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: HUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: Bessy Pocasangre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?