The Legacy Foundation v. Department Of Defense
Plaintiff: The Legacy Foundation
Defendant: Department Of Defense
Case Number: 1:2019cv00758
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 So Ordered in re #10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by The Legacy Foundation. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 07/02/2019. (jlan)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by The Legacy Foundation (Torchinsky, Jason)
July 1, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (dvanm, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Hearing Date set for JULY 19, 2019 re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (McCotter, R.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Department Of Defense. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Final Response)(McCotter, R.)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Department Of Defense. (McCotter, R.)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Department Of Defense, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
June 11, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (jlan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Department of Justice by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Department of Defense by The Legacy Foundation. (Torchinsky, Jason)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6684154.), filed by The Legacy Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A, #2 Appendix Appendix B, #3 Appendix Appendix C, #4 Appendix Appendix D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Torchinsky, Jason) (Attachment 5 replaced on 6/11/2019) (jlan, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Legacy Foundation v. Department Of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department Of Defense
Represented By: R. Trent McCotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Legacy Foundation
Represented By: Jason Brett Torchinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?