Hunter v. Sallie Mae Bank
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hunter
Defendant: SLM Corporation and Sallie Mae Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv00760
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/9/2019. (rban, )
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/9/2019. (rban, )
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christoper Ramos and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Hass Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6778070. by Sallie Mae Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hass, Michael)
August 7, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Lisa Simonetti and Certification of Local Counsel Michael Hass Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6778069. by Sallie Mae Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hass, Michael)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/31/19. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Sallie Mae Bank. (Hass, Michael)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Sallie Mae Bank.(Hass, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. ORDERED that Defendant shall respond to the complaint on or before July 29,2019. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/17/19. (klau, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Sallie Mae Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hass, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF DISMISSAL AND SUBSTITUTION that the Defendant, SLM Corporation, is dismissed, without prejudice, from this matter, and that Sallie Mae Bank is hereby substituted and joined as Defendant in the Class Action Complaint asserted by Plaintiff herein, and any and all claims previously asserted against dismissed Defendant SLM Corporation shall be hereinafter deemed asserted against Defendant Sallie Mae Bank substituted and joined herein. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/24/19. (klau, )
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Substitution by Jeremy Hunter. (Harnishfeger, John)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice of John Allen Yanchunis. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/17/2019. (lcre, )
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice Jonathan Betten Cohen. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/17/2019. (lcre, )
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Allen Yanchunis and Certification of Local Counsel John Glenn Harnishfeger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6690839. by Jeremy Hunter. (Harnishfeger, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Betten Cohen and Certification of Local Counsel John Glenn Harnishfeger Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6690781. by Jeremy Hunter. (Harnishfeger, John)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to SLM Corporation. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
June 11, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Jeremy Hunter. (Harnishfeger, John)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against SLM Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6685256.), filed by Jeremy Hunter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Harnishfeger, John) Modified text on 6/11/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunter v. Sallie Mae Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLM Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sallie Mae Bank
Represented By: Michael Adams Hass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Hunter
Represented By: John Glenn Harnishfeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?