McEwing v. Northstar Location Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Susan McEwing
Defendant: Northstar Location Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00777
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 So Ordered re #5 Notice of Settlement filed by Susan McEwing. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 7/9/2019. (rban, )
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Settlement by Susan McEwing (Webb, Francis)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Susan McEwing Northstar Location Services, LLC served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019 (Webb, Francis)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Northstar Location Services, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachment for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, )
June 13, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (pmil, )
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Susan McEwing. (Webb, Francis)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6690128.), filed by Susan McEwing. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Webb, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McEwing v. Northstar Location Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan McEwing
Represented By: Francis Alexander Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Location Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?