Devil's Reach Condominium Unit Owners Association, Inc. v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Devil's Reach Condominium Unit Owners Association, Inc.
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00818
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Answer to Plaintiff's More Definite Statement and Affirmative Defenses by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ross, Robert)
August 15, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Substitution of Counsel of Timothy Mark Purnell by Timothy Mark Purnell on behalf of Devil's Reach Condominium Unit Owners Association, Inc. (Purnell, Timothy)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 Reply More Definite Statement filed by Devil's Reach Condominium Unit Owners Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Hinds, Andrew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Edward Hinds on behalf of Devil's Reach Condominium Unit Owners Association, Inc. (Hinds, Andrew)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion for More Definite Statement (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 06/19/2019. (jlan)
July 16, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Devil's Reach Condominium Unit Owners Association, Inc.. (Purnell, Timothy)
July 15, 2019 Reset Deadline as to #5 MOTION for More Definite Statement . Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (jlan)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED that argument of defendant's Motion for More Definite Statement [Dkt. No. 5] be and is advanced to Wednesday, July 24, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned judge. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 07/15/2019. (jlan)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Joint Discovery Plan (Dkt. 7), and taking note of the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 3) entered in this case, the Court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by Friday, November 15, 2019. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan, as modified by the Court, is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. 3. The pretrial conference scheduled for Wednesday, July 17, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled. 4. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall be completed within fifteen (15) days of the date of this Order. 5. No "general objection" may be asserted in response to any discovery demand except to preserve the attorney-client privilege and work product protection. (see Order for details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 7/12/19. (tfitz, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Ross, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for More Definite Statement . Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (dvanm, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Hearing Date July 26, 2019 re #5 MOTION for More Definite Statement (Montgomery, Diane)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for More Definite Statement)(Montgomery, Diane)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Diane U. Montgomery on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Montgomery, Diane)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/27/19. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy)
June 20, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (rban, )
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Ross, Robert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6699791.), filed by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Devil's Reach Complaint - Prince William County, #2 Exhibit 2 - NW Motion for Bill of Particulars, #3 Exhibit 3 - NW Motion Craving Oyer, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ross, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devil's Reach Condominium Unit Owners Association, Inc. v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devil's Reach Condominium Unit Owners Association, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Edward Hinds
Represented By: Donald Eugene Coulter
Represented By: Timothy Mark Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert Tayloe Ross
Represented By: Diane U. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?