American Chemical Society v. ACSMobile.org
Plaintiff: American Chemical Society
Defendant: ACSMobile.org
Case Number: 1:2019cv00823
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Buchanan. #31 MOTION for Default Judgment as to ACSMobile.org (clar, )
August 14, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #31 MOTION for Default Judgment as to ACSMobile.org. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (clar, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Hearing Date Friday, September 13, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. re #31 MOTION for Default Judgment as to ACSMobile.org (Barnes, Attison)
August 13, 2019 Filing 32 Memorandum in Support re #31 MOTION for Default Judgment as to ACSMobile.org filed by American Chemical Society. (Barnes, Attison)
August 13, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Default Judgment as to ACSMobile.org by American Chemical Society. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Attison)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER directing that on or before August 16, 2019, Plaintiff file a motion for default judgment pursuant to Rule 55(b); directing that Plaintiff file a notice setting a hearing on the motion for default judgment before the magistrate judge to whom this action is referred. (See Order for further details). Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 8/8/2019. (aott, c/m 8/8/2019 )
August 7, 2019 Filing 29 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to ACSMobile.org (dvanm, )
August 6, 2019 Filing 28 Request for Entry of Default as to by American Chemical Society. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Brian Owczarczak)(Barnes, Attison)
July 16, 2019 Filing 27 BOND in the amount of $500.00 posted by American Chemical Society (dvanm, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 26 Declaration re #20 Order on Motion for Service by Publication by American Chemical Society. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Barnes, Attison)
July 16, 2019 Filing 25 Declaration re #20 Order on Motion for Service by Publication by American Chemical Society. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Barnes, Attison)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 07/16/2019. (dvanm, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Seal Corrected by American Chemical Society. (Barnes, Attison)
July 16, 2019 Notice of Correction re #12 MOTION to Seal Declaration of David E. Weslow. Filing user notified to sign and refile motion. (dvanm, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, it is HEREBY ORDERED that: 1. Public Interest Registry is HEREBY DIRECTED to place the ACSMobile.org domain name on registryHold/serverHold or such other status to render the name/site non-resolving until further order from this Court; 2. A bond in the amount of $500 shall be posted; 3. American Chemical Society shall provide a copy of this order via email to the current registrar of the ACSMobile.org domain name to be forwarded to the current registrant, and shall provide a copy of this order via email to Public Interest Registry. (see order for details)Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/12/19. (yguy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr:Motion Hearing held on 7/12/2019. Appearance of pltf counsel. Deft did not appear. Court advised of case status. Pltf adduced evidence. Court takes judicial notice. Pltf's #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction is argued and GRANTED. Domain name shall be placed in serverhold status effective today. (order to follow) (Court Reporter J. Egal.)(yguy)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Service by Publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 07/11/2019. (see order for details) (dvanm, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by American Chemical Society re #12 MOTION to Seal Declaration of David E. Weslow (Barnes, Attison)
July 9, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2019 at 12:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr.. (rban, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 07/08/2019. (dvanm, )
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 07/08/2019. (dvanm, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Hearing Date re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Barnes, Attison)
July 8, 2019 Notice of Correction re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 Sealed Document re #12 MOTION to Seal Declaration of David E. Weslow.(Barnes, Attison)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by American Chemical Society re #12 MOTION to Seal Declaration of David E. Weslow (Barnes, Attison)
July 5, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Seal Declaration of David E. Weslow filed by American Chemical Society. (Barnes, Attison)
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Seal Declaration of David E. Weslow by American Chemical Society. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Attison)
July 5, 2019 Filing 11 Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Chemical Society. (Barnes, Attison)
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by American Chemical Society. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Attison)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of re #7 MOTION for Service by Publication Hearing by American Chemical Society (Barnes, Attison)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by American Chemical Society. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Brian Owczarczak)(Barnes, Attison)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Service by Publication by American Chemical Society. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Attison)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Service by Publication by American Chemical Society. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alexander Brian Owczarczak)(Barnes, Attison)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David E. Weslow and Certification of Local Counsel Attison L. Barnes Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6724768. by American Chemical Society. (Barnes, Attison)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexander Brian Owczarczak and Certification of Local Counsel Attison L. Barnes Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6724751. by American Chemical Society. (Barnes, Attison)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by American Chemical Society re #1 Complaint, (Barnes, Attison) Modified to correct text on 6/24/2019 (dvanm, ).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the filing or determination of an action of a trademark. (lcre, )(c/s)
June 21, 2019 Notice of Correction: Filing user has been notified to refile the document with appropriate signature re [1-1] Civil Cover Sheet, (lcre, )
June 21, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (lcre, )
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against ACSMobile.org ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6701842.), filed by American Chemical Society. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Disclosure Statement, #6 Verification)(Barnes, Attison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Chemical Society v. ACSMobile.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Chemical Society
Represented By: Attison Leonard Barnes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACSMobile.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?