Nash v. Inverness Technologies Inc

Plaintiff: Corena Nash
Defendant: Inverness Technologies Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00835
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/14/2019. (rban, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Corena Nash (Hantzes, Nicholas)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that the deadline to file a stipulated order of dismissal or an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint to extended through and including August 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 08/02/2019. (choy, )
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part #6 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended through and including August 8, 2019. Unless there is a representation by all counsel that this case has been resolved, no further extensions will be considered. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 07/31/2019. (wgar, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Inverness Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Ian)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - Inverness Technologies Inc answer due 7/31/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 07/17/19. (cmar, )
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Inverness Technologies Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Ian)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Inverness Technologies Inc. on 6/28/2019, filed by Corena Nash. (Hantzes, Nicholas) Modified on 7/2/2019 to correct served party information (acha, ).
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Inverness Technologies Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
June 21, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (acha, )
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6703878.), filed by Corena Nash. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Hantzes, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nash v. Inverness Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corena Nash
Represented By: Nicholas H. Hantzes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inverness Technologies Inc
Represented By: Ian S. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?