Coomes v. Gorman
Appellant: Elizabeth H. Coomes
Interested Party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Appellee: Thomas P. Gorman
Case Number: 1:2019cv00845
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER of USCA as to #10 Notice of Appeal filed by Elizabeth H. Coomes, #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Elizabeth H. Coomes. The court consolidates case Nos. 19-1813, 19-1814, 19-1815, 19-1817, 19-1818, 19-1819, 19-1820, 19-1821, 19-1822, 19-1824, 19-1825, 19-1826, 19-1827, 19-1828, 19-1830, 19-1831, 19-1832, 19-1834, 19-1836, 19-1837, 19-1838, 19-1839, 19-1840, 19-1842, 19-1870 with case No. 19-1811. All documents should be filed in the lead case, case No. 19-1811. (rban, )
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 Transmission of AMENDED Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #10 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (dvanm, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order, #3 Order,,, by Elizabeth H. Coomes. (dvanm, )
August 6, 2019 Assembled INITIAL Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #6 Notice of Appeal (dvanm, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from 4th CCA requesting transmittal of record. (dvanm, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 USCA Case Number 19-1815 4th CCA, case manager Cathy Herb, for #6 Notice of Appeal filed by Elizabeth H. Coomes. (dvanm, )
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #6 Notice of Appeal (All case opening forms, plus the transcript guidelines, may be obtained from the Fourth Circuit's website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov) (dvanm, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Order, by Elizabeth H. Coomes. (dvanm, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Coomes v. Gorman, Civil Action No. l:19CV640 (CMH/JFA) and Coomes v. Gorman, Civil Action l:19CV845 (CMH/JFA) are hereby consolidated, and all future filings shall be made in Civil Action No. 1:19CV640 (CMH/J FA). Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/10/19. (klau, )
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Elizabeth H. Coomes (Attachments: #1 Returned Document) (aott, )
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion for Extension of Time to the extent it refers to any of the above-captioned appeals, and it is hereby ORDERED that Coomes's motion be docketed in 1:19-cv-640; and it is further ORDERED that Coomes may not file anything further in 1:19-cv-771, -773, -774, -775, -776, -781, -782, -783, -784, -785, -786, -787, -788, -789, -790, -791, -792, -793, -794, -795, -796, -797, -798, or -799, which are closed actions. This Order does not bar Coomes from filing notices of appeal of the orders dismissing these appeals as duplicative of the appeals raised in 1:19-cv-640; nonetheless, the Court advises Coomes that any such appeal would likely be futile because all of the issues she has raised in these dismissed appeals remain pending in 1:19-cv-640. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 06/27/2019. (dvanm, ) (c/m)
June 25, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Claude M. Hilton. District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema no longer assigned to the case. (dvanm, )
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED that the appeals docketed as 1:19-cv-771, -773, -774, -775, -776, -781, -782, -783, -784, -785, -786, -787, -788, -789, -790, -791, -792, -793, -794, -795, -796, -797, -798, and -799 be and are DISMISSED as duplicative of the appeals in 1:19-cv-640; and it is further ORDERED that the appeal docketed as 1:19-cv-845 be and is REASSIGNED to Senior Judge Claude M. Hilton. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 06/25/2019. (c/m 6/25/19)(dvanm, )
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-13497-BFK. File received, filed by Elizabeth H. Coomes. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal Transmittal Sheet)(acha, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coomes v. Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Elizabeth H. Coomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Thomas P. Gorman
Represented By: Marcelo Ramiro Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?