Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Woldesillassie, et al.

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Frezer Woldesillassie, Purple Ethiopian Restaurant & Lounge LLC and Frezer Senay
Case Number: 1:2019cv00856
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Purple Ethiopian Restaurant & Lounge LLC, Frezer Woldesillassie (klau, )
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 Request for Entry of Default as to Frezer Woldesillassie and Purple Ethiopian Restaurant & Lounge by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Support of Clerks Entry, #2 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Riddle, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Pltf immediately obtain an entry of default against Defts from the Clerk pursuant to FRCP 55(a); on or before 08/16/19, Pltf file a motion for default judgment pursuant to FRCP 55(b) and an accompanying Memorandum setting forth the factual and legal support for findings that (see Order for details); Pltf file a notice of hearing on the motion for default judgment before the magistrate judge to whom this action is referred. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 08/09/19. (pmil, )
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Executed as to Purple Ethiopian Restaurant & Lounge LLC served on July 9, 2019, answer due 7/30/19, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Riddle, Jeffrey) Modified text on 7/23/2019 to correct event (klau, ). Modified text on 8/15/2019 (klau, ).
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Executed as to Frezer Woldesillassie served on July 17, 2019, answer due 8/7/19, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Riddle, Jeffrey) Modified text on 7/23/2019 to correct event (klau, ).
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 6/28/2019. (rban, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Report on the filing or determination of an action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright AO121 Form Copyright by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Riddle, Jeffrey) Modified text on 6/28/2019, Copy mailed to Copyright Office Library of Congress. (klau, ).
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Julie Cohen Lonstein and Certification of Local Counsel Jeffrey Floyd Riddle Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6713182. by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing)(Riddle, Jeffrey)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Riddle, Jeffrey)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Purple Ethiopian Restaurant & Lounge LLC, Frezer Woldesillassie. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
June 27, 2019 Notice of Correction re [1-3] Supplement Corporate Disclosure, The filing user has been notified to refile as a separate document. (klau, )
June 27, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (klau, )
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Purple Ethiopian Restaurant & Lounge LLC by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Riddle, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Frezer Woldesillassie by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Riddle, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Frezer Woldesillassie, Purple Ethiopian Restaurant & Lounge LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6712064.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Appendix A to Complaint - Advertisement, #3 Supplement Corporate Disclosure)(Riddle, Jeffrey) Modified text on 6/27/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Woldesillassie, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frezer Woldesillassie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purple Ethiopian Restaurant & Lounge LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frezer Senay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Floyd Riddle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?