Munive v. Fairfax County School Board
Plaintiff: Kathleen Munive
Defendant: Fairfax County School Board
Case Number: 1:2019cv00867
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Discovery due by 1/10/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (c/s to pro se pltf) Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/14/19. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy)
August 12, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (clar, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Hearing Date set for September 13, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. (Kirkland, Laurie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Fairfax County School Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2018 Complaint)(Kirkland, Laurie)
August 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Fairfax County School Board. (Kirkland, Laurie)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Fairfax County School Board. (pmil, )
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fairfax County School Board filed by Kathleen Munive ( Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 14683079363). (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(pmil, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munive v. Fairfax County School Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfax County School Board
Represented By: Laurie Lea Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Munive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?