Greenhill et al v. Loudoun County Public School Board
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Greenhill and Kewin Greenhill
Defendant: Loudoun County Public School Board
Case Number: 1:2019cv00868
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: T S Ellis
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Kewin Greenhill. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 83.1 (M) Certificaiton)(choy, )
August 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. Motion Hearing RESET for 9/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (tran)
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Hearing Date (REVISED) set for 9/20/2019 re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. (Bart, Alan)
August 12, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Hearing Date set for 09/13/2019 re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. (Bart, Alan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Douglas Bart on behalf of Loudoun County Public School Board (Bart, Alan)
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Loudoun County Public School Board. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Ballum, Jason)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Loudoun County Public School Board. (Ballum, Jason)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 (Alias)Summons Issued as to Loudoun County Public School Board. (Summons reissued due to wrong spelling of defendant and wrong address on the original summons issued on 6/28/19) (klau, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued to be served by SPS as to Loudoun County Public School Board. (jlan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Loudoun County Public School Board (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683079391) filed by Kewin Greenhill, Elizabeth Greenhill. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt)(jlan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenhill et al v. Loudoun County Public School Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loudoun County Public School Board
Represented By: Jason Henry Ballum
Represented By: Alan Douglas Bart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Greenhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kewin Greenhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?