Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation v. Shehadi et al
Plaintiff: Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation
Defendant: Ramez Tannous Shehadi and Walid Fayad
3Rd Party Defendant: Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00869
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 So Ordered re #55 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 12/7/2020. (ahas)
December 4, 2020 Filing 55 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. (Boyd, Benjamin)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER cancelling Status Conference scheduled for Friday, November 20, 2020; directing that the court will have a telephone conference with counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/18/2020. (aott, )
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal; continuing the status conference to Friday, November 20, 2020 at 10:00 a.m.; directing that if parties file a dismissal order by November 16, 2020, the status conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/21/2020. (shea)
October 21, 2020 Filing 52 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Walid Fayad, Ramez Tannous Shehadi. (Clair, Bethany)
October 21, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (shea)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER directing if a stipulated order of dismissal has not been filed by Thursday, Octoer 22, 202 counsel for the parties shall appear for a status conference before the undersigned on Friday, October 23, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/9/2020. (shea)
October 9, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (shea)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 Joint MOTION to Vacate Current Scheduling Order in Light of Settlement in Principle by Walid Fayad, Ramez Tannous Shehadi. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/10/2020. (See order for further details). (acha, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 49 Joint MOTION to Vacate Current Scheduling Order in Light of Settlement in Principle by Walid Fayad, Ramez Tannous Shehadi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clair, Bethany)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER - ORDERED that the Scheduling Order is hereby modified to provide that all discovery be completed by July 10, 2020, and the final pretrial conference is rescheduled to Thursday, July 16, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. No further extensions of the discovery period will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 04/21/2020. (wgar, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 47 Joint MOTION for Extension of Pretrial Deadlines by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation, Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyd, Benjamin)
April 21, 2020 Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Final Pretrial Conference reset for 7/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (wgar, )
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Re Handling and Labeling of Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 03/02/2020. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Protective Order Stipulation by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation, Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc.. (Boyd, Benjamin)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the representations made in the Joint Discovery Plan (Docket no. 43) and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Docket no. 42), the court makes the following rulings: The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 01/22/2020. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
January 21, 2020 Filing 43 Joint Discovery Plan by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation.(Boyd, Benjamin)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. Discovery due by 5/15/2020. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 01/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(jlan)
November 19, 2019 Filing 41 Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation and Booz Allen Hamilton Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation, Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc..(Boyd, Benjamin)
November 5, 2019 Filing 40 Amended Third Party Complaint against Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation, Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc., filed by Ramez Tannous Shehadi, Walid Fayad.(Clair, Bethany)
November 5, 2019 Filing 39 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation, filed by Ramez Tannous Shehadi, Walid Fayad.(Clair, Bethany)
October 15, 2019 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc.. (Boyd, Benjamin)
October 15, 2019 Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. (Boyd, Benjamin) Modified on 10/16/2019 Counsel refiled corrected Financial Disclosure Statement as dkt. no. 38 (klau, ).
October 15, 2019 Filing 36 Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint Against Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc. by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation.(Boyd, Benjamin)
September 30, 2019 Filing 35 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ramez Tannous Shehadi, Walid Fayad Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc. served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019 (Clair, Bethany) Modified on 10/1/2019 to correct docket entry (acha, ).
September 24, 2019 Filing 34 Third Party Complaint Summons Issued as to Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
September 24, 2019 Filing 33 Proposed Summons re #32 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Walid Fayad, Ramez Tannous Shehadi. (Clair, Bethany)
September 24, 2019 Filing 32 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation, Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation by Walid Fayad, Ramez Tannous Shehadi.(Clair, Bethany)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Withdraw Lindsay Robertson Barnes, III as attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/11/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
September 11, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Lindsay Barnes by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyd, Benjamin)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' #2 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED, arguments regarding issue preclusion may be raised without prejudice after the conclusion of discovery. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 9/9/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
August 22, 2019 Per CMH chambers motions set for 8/23/19 on the pleadings (clar, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 28 Reply to Motion re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Walid Fayad, Ramez Tannous Shehadi. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Clair, Bethany)
July 26, 2019 Filing 27 Declaration re #21 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Neil Crossley by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Boyd, Benjamin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 26 Declaration re #21 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Elizabeth Thompson by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Boyd, Benjamin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 25 Declaration re #21 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Tori Simpson by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boyd, Benjamin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 24 Declaration re #21 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Zachary Prillaman by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Boyd, Benjamin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 23 Declaration re #21 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Lisa Robey by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Boyd, Benjamin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 22 Declaration re #21 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Christopher Ling by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. (Boyd, Benjamin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 21 Memorandum in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. (Boyd, Benjamin)
July 26, 2019 Filing 20 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. (Boyd, Benjamin)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Richard Scott Kelley. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 7/22/2019. (See order for further details) (acha, )
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Robertson Barnes, III on behalf of Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation (Barnes, Lindsay)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard Kelley by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyd, Benjamin)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice for Patrick Lum Ryan. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/18/2019. (acha, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice for Jeffrey David Mokotoff. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/18/2019. (acha, )
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The due date for Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss shall be continued for one week, up to and including July 26, 2019 and the due date for Defendants' Reply Brief shall be extended up to and including Friday, August 9, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 07/18/19. (cmar, )
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of re #12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Due Dates for Briefs in Opposition and Reply to Motion to Dismiss Waiver of Hearing by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation (Boyd, Benjamin)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Due Dates for Briefs in Opposition and Reply to Motion to Dismiss by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Boyd, Benjamin)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Lum Ryan and Certification of Local Counsel B. Patrice Clair Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6739200. by Walid Fayad, Ramez Tannous Shehadi. (Clair, Bethany)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey David Mokotoff and Certification of Local Counsel B. Patrice Clair Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6739160. by Walid Fayad, Ramez Tannous Shehadi. (Clair, Bethany)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice for Britt Condell Hamilton. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/12/2019. (acha, )
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice for Daniel Evan Turinsky. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 7/12/2019. (acha, )
July 12, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Hearing Date re #3 Memorandum in Support, #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Clair, Bethany)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Britt Condell Hamilton and Certification of Local Counsel Benjamin S. Boyd Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6728733. by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. (Boyd, Benjamin)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Evan Turinsky and Certification of Local Counsel Benjamin S. Boyd Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6728701. by Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation. (Boyd, Benjamin)
July 8, 2019 Notice of Correction re #4 Notice of Hearing Date. Incorrect Docket Event. (clar, )
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Hearing Date set for TBD re #3 Memorandum in Support, #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Clair, Bethany)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Walid Fayad, Ramez Tannous Shehadi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Clair, Bethany)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Walid Fayad, Ramez Tannous Shehadi. (Clair, Bethany)
June 28, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6715421.), filed by Walid Fayad, Ramez Tannous Shehadi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Part 1, #3 Exhibit Part 2)(Clair, Bethany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation v. Shehadi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Booz Allen Hamilton Holding Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin Sorrells Boyd
Represented By: Richard Scott Kelley
Represented By: Lindsay Robertson Barnes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramez Tannous Shehadi
Represented By: Bethany Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walid Fayad
Represented By: Bethany Clair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Booz Allen Hamilton, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Sorrells Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?