Unit Owners Association of Stonington Condominium v. Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Unit Owners Association of Stonington Condominium, a/k/a Stonington Condominium Association, a/k/a Stonington Condominium, Unit Owners Association of Stonington Condominium, Stonington Condominium Association and Stonington Condominium
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation and Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00872
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Substitution of Counsel of Timothy Mark Purnell by Timothy Mark Purnell on behalf of Unit Owners Association of Stonington Condominium (Purnell, Timothy)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/17/2020 at 01:30 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. Discovery due by 1/10/2020.. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(awac, )
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Unit Owners Association of Stonington Condominium. (Hinds, Andrew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Edward Hinds on behalf of Unit Owners Association of Stonington Condominium (Hinds, Andrew)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence Alexis Dunn on behalf of Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc., QBE Insurance Corporation (Dunn, Lawrence)
July 1, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott, )
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by QBE Insurance Corporation. (Wright, Gibson)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc.. (Wright, Gibson)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6716482.), filed by QBE Insurance Corporation, Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Wright, Gibson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unit Owners Association of Stonington Condominium v. Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QBE Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Represented By: Lawrence Alexis Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Association Underwriters of America, Inc.
Represented By: Gibson Sinclair Wright
Represented By: Lawrence Alexis Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unit Owners Association of Stonington Condominium, a/k/a Stonington Condominium Association, a/k/a Stonington Condominium
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unit Owners Association of Stonington Condominium
Represented By: Andrew Edward Hinds
Represented By: Donald Eugene Coulter
Represented By: Timothy Mark Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stonington Condominium Association
Represented By: Andrew Edward Hinds
Represented By: Donald Eugene Coulter
Represented By: Timothy Mark Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stonington Condominium
Represented By: Andrew Edward Hinds
Represented By: Donald Eugene Coulter
Represented By: Timothy Mark Purnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?