Duru v. President Trump Administration et al
Plaintiff: Rose Adanma Duru
Defendant: U.S. Court of Appeals, Nathalia Cibolti, Randall A. Constantine, Social Security Administration-SSA, HCA Healthcare Corporation of America, Office of Attorney General Texas, Mazursky Constantine, LLC, Dr. Michael F. Doherty, Kaiser Permanente Maryland, U.S.P.S., Kaiser Permanente U.S.A. Inc., Kaiser Permanente Northern CA, Office of the Clerk, Mark Langley, Geoffrey Beckham, Craig Faerber, David R. Clouston, Mr. Henry J. Kaiser, The Northern Trust Company, The State Department of the United States of America, Dr. Robert "Rob" Schreiner, President Trump Administration, Un-Named Black Female Co-Defendant Bailey's Crossroads Center, H & R Block Advisors, State of Texas-Judicial Court, Christopher P. Richie, Bank of America U.S.A. Inc., Angela D. Caesar, Kaiser Family Foundation, Court Administrator, Kaiser Permanente Colorado, Mr. Charles Schwab, H & R Block Bailey's Crossroads Center, Bank of America, Mr. Kerry Kohnen, Henrietta King, U.S. Civil Court Administrators, Kaiser Permanente Venture Investments, The Southeast Permanente Medical Group-TSPMG, Un-Named Co-Defendant-White Female Physician Executive-KPGA, Kaiser Permanente Georgia, The Permanente Federation, LLC, Kaiser Permanente Virginia, Internal Revenue Service, Leslye E. Mosley, Law Firm- Sessions, Fishman, Nathan and Israel, LLP, Melinda Louie, U.S.P.S, H & R Block U.S.A. Inc., Deputy Clerks of U.S. Courthouse-DC, Jodi Maddox, Pathways to Housing DC, Rex Tillerson, Mr. Kim Kaiser, Kaiser Permanente Capitol Hill, Kaiser Permanente Southern CA, The City of Washington, DC District of Columbia Government, Charles Schwab and H&R Block Eastern Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00874
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by H & R Block Advisors, H & R Block Bailey's Crossroads Center, H & R Block U.S.A. Inc., H&R Block Eastern Enterprises, Inc. re #9 Memorandum in Support, #8 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, Motion to Quash Service, with Roseboro,. of Non-Opposition (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Ellis)
August 27, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss and for Entry of a Pre-filing injunction. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
August 26, 2019 Filing 30 Notice of Hearing Date set for 09/20/2019 re #11 MOTION to Dismiss and for Entry of a Pre-filing injunction (Machado, Leslie)
August 22, 2019 Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Hearing Date (Amended) set for 09/20/2019 re #15 MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. (McGraw, Wendy)
August 20, 2019 Per LO chambers motions set for 8/30/19 have been removed from the docket and the parties have been notified to file an Amended Notice of Hearing - Deadlines Terminated (clar, )
August 15, 2019 Filing 28 Waiver of re #9 Memorandum in Support, #8 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, Motion to Quash Service, with Roseboro,. Waiver of Oral Argument by H & R Block Advisors, H & R Block Bailey's Crossroads Center, H & R Block U.S.A. Inc., H&R Block Eastern Enterprises, Inc. (Bennett, Ellis)
August 9, 2019 Filing 27 Waiver of by Geoffrey Beckham, Melinda Louie, Jodi Maddox, Charles Schwab(401K/IRA), Charles Schwab(Schwab) (Prior, Francis)
August 9, 2019 Filing 26 Waiver of re #23 First MOTION to Dismiss by David R. Clouston, Law Firm- Sessions, Fishman, Nathan and Israel, LLP, Leslye E. Mosley, Christopher P. Richie (Prior, Francis)
August 9, 2019 Filing 25 Roseboro Notice as to Motion to Dismiss by Geoffrey Beckham, Melinda Louie, Jodi Maddox, Charles Schwab(401K/IRA), Charles Schwab(Schwab) (Prior, Francis)
August 9, 2019 Filing 24 Roseboro Notice as to Motion to Dismiss by David R. Clouston, Law Firm- Sessions, Fishman, Nathan and Israel, LLP, Leslye E. Mosley, Christopher P. Richie (Prior, Francis)
August 9, 2019 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #23 First MOTION to Dismiss (lcre, )
August 9, 2019 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #22 First MOTION to Dismiss (lcre, )
August 8, 2019 Filing 23 First MOTION to Dismiss by David R. Clouston, Law Firm- Sessions, Fishman, Nathan and Israel, LLP, Leslye E. Mosley, Christopher P. Richie. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Prior, Francis)
August 8, 2019 Filing 22 First MOTION to Dismiss by Geoffrey Beckham, Melinda Louie, Jodi Maddox, Charles Schwab(401K/IRA), Charles Schwab(Schwab). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Prior, Francis)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Pro hac vice of Georgia L. Lucier. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 8/1/2019. (lcre, )
August 1, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
July 31, 2019 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Georgia L. Lucier and Certification of Local Counsel Wendy C. McGraw Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6766710. by The Northern Trust Company. (McGraw, Wendy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy Cohen McGraw on behalf of The Northern Trust Company (McGraw, Wendy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by The Northern Trust Company. (McGraw, Wendy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Hearing Date set for 8/30/2019 re #15 MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. (McGraw, Wendy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Support re #15 MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. filed by The Northern Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(McGraw, Wendy)
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss with Roseboro,. by The Northern Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order)(McGraw, Wendy)
July 31, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss and for Entry of a Pre-filing injunction. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
July 31, 2019 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #8 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, Motion to Quash Service, with Roseboro,. (lcre, )
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Hearing Date set for 8/30/2019 re #11 MOTION to Dismiss and for Entry of a Pre-filing injunction (Machado, Leslie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #11 MOTION to Dismiss and for Entry of a Pre-filing injunction filed by HCA Healthcare Corporation of America(Corporate Headquarters-One Park Plaza), HCA Healthcare Corporation of America(North Texas Division). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Machado, Leslie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 Roseboro Notice as to Motion to Dismiss and for Entry of a Pre-filing injunction by HCA Healthcare Corporation of America(Corporate Headquarters-One Park Plaza), HCA Healthcare Corporation of America(North Texas Division) (Machado, Leslie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss and for Entry of a Pre-filing injunction by HCA Healthcare Corporation of America(Corporate Headquarters-One Park Plaza), HCA Healthcare Corporation of America(North Texas Division). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Machado, Leslie)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HCA Healthcare Corporation of America(North Texas Division). (Machado, Leslie)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, Motion to Quash Service, with Roseboro,. filed by H & R Block Advisors, H & R Block Bailey's Crossroads Center, H & R Block U.S.A. Inc., H&R Block Eastern Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bennett, Ellis)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the Alternative, Motion to Quash Service, with Roseboro,. by H & R Block Advisors, H & R Block Bailey's Crossroads Center, H & R Block U.S.A. Inc., H&R Block Eastern Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Bennett, Ellis)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to: Nathalia Cibolti, David R. Clouston, Michael F. Doherty, Craig Faerber, Henry J. Kaiser, Kim Kaiser, Kaiser Permanente Capitol Hill, Kaiser Permanente Colorado, Kaiser Permanente Georgia, Kaiser Permanente Maryland, Kaiser Permanente Northern CA, Kaiser Permanente Southern CA, Kaiser Permanente U.S.A. Inc., Kaiser Permanente Venture Investments, Kaiser Permanente Virginia, Henrietta King, Kerry Kohnen, Law Firm- Sessions, Fishman, Nathan and Israel, LLP, Leslye E. Mosley, Pathways to Housing DC, Christopher P. Richie, Robert "Rob" Schreiner, The Permanente Federation, LLC, The Southeast Permanente Medical Group-TSPMG, Un-Named Co-Defendant-White Female Physician Executive-KPGA. (acha, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to: Bank of America, Bank of America U.S.A. Inc., Geoffrey Beckham, Randall A. Constantine, Court Administrator, H & R Block Advisors, H & R Block Bailey's Crossroads Center, H & R Block U.S.A. Inc., HCA Healthcare Corporation of America(Corporate Headquarters-One Park Plaza), HCA Healthcare Corporation of America(North Texas Division), Kaiser Family Foundation, Melinda Louie, Jodi Maddox, Mazursky Constantine, LLC, Office of Attorney General Texas, Charles Schwab(401K/IRA), Charles Schwab(Schwab), State of Texas-Judicial Court, The City of Washington, DC District of Columbia Government, The Northern Trust Company, Un-Named Black Female Co-Defendant Bailey's Crossroads Center. (acha, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued to USA by SPS as to: Deputy Clerks of U.S. Courthouse-DC, Internal Revenue Service, Mark Langley, Office of the Clerk, President Trump Administration, Social Security Administration-SSA, The State Department of the United States of America, Rex Tillerson, U.S. Civil Court Administrators, U.S. Court of Appeals, U.S.P.S(Dallas, Texas), U.S.P.S(San Francisco, CA), U.S. Attorney-EDVA G. Zachary Terwilliger and U.S. Attorney General- William Barr. (acha, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT (Part 4-) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683079416.), filed by Rose Adanma Duru. (acha, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT (Part 3-) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683079416.), filed by Rose Adanma Duru. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 2)(acha, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (Part 2-) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683079416.), filed by Rose Adanma Duru. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of 2)(acha, )
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683079416.), filed by Rose Adanma Duru. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(acha, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duru v. President Trump Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Court of Appeals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathalia Cibolti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall A. Constantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration-SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCA Healthcare Corporation of America
Represented By: Leslie Paul Machado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Attorney General Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazursky Constantine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Michael F. Doherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.P.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Northern CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Clerk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Langley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Beckham
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Faerber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Clouston
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Henry J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Northern Trust Company
Represented By: Wendy Cohen McGraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State Department of the United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Robert "Rob" Schreiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Trump Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Un-Named Black Female Co-Defendant Bailey's Crossroads Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & R Block Advisors
Represented By: Ellis L. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Texas-Judicial Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher P. Richie
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela D. Caesar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Family Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Court Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Charles Schwab
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & R Block Bailey's Crossroads Center
Represented By: Ellis L. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Kerry Kohnen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henrietta King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Civil Court Administrators
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Venture Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Southeast Permanente Medical Group-TSPMG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Un-Named Co-Defendant-White Female Physician Executive-KPGA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Georgia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Permanente Federation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslye E. Mosley
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Firm- Sessions, Fishman, Nathan and Israel, LLP
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Louie
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.P.S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & R Block U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Ellis L. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Clerks of U.S. Courthouse-DC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodi Maddox
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pathways to Housing DC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Tillerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Kim Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Capitol Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Southern CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Washington, DC District of Columbia Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab
Represented By: Francis Joseph Prior, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&R Block Eastern Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Ellis L. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Adanma Duru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?