Hassan v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Shahira Hassan
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan, Jedidah Hussey, Ken Cuccinelli, William Barr and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv00886
Filed: July 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shahira Hassan. William Barr served on 7/29/2019, answer due 9/27/2019; Jedidah Hussey served on 7/30/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (Roberts, James)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to William Barr (U.S. Attorney General), Ken Cuccinelli, Jedidah Hussey, Kevin McAleenan and U.S. Attorney NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
July 5, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
July 4, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shahira Hassan. (Roberts, James)
July 4, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons to Hussey by Shahira Hassan. (Roberts, James)
July 4, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to McAleenan by Shahira Hassan. (Roberts, James)
July 4, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Barr by Shahira Hassan. (Roberts, James)
July 4, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Terwilliger by Shahira Hassan. (Roberts, James)
July 4, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Cuccinelli by Shahira Hassan. (Roberts, James)
July 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint against Kevin McAleenan, William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Jedidah Hussey in Nature of Mandamus ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6723783.), filed by Shahira Hassan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Exh A, #4 Exhibit Exh B, #5 Exhibit Exh C, #6 Exhibit Exh D, #7 Exhibit Exh E)(Roberts, James) Modified text on 7/5/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hassan v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jedidah Hussey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shahira Hassan
Represented By: James Algernon Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?