Malibu Media, LLC. v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC.
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv00896
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 7/11/19. (klau, )
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 7/10/19. (klau, )
July 9, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (klau, )
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jon A. Hoppe and Certification of Local Counsel John C. Decker, II Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6727578. by Malibu Media, LLC.. (Decker, John)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Malibu Media, LLC. re #1 Complaint of Filing an Action Regarding Copyright (Decker, John) Modified on 7/9/2019 Copy mailed to U.S. Copyright Office. (klau, ).
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of re #3 MOTION for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena of Oral Argument by Malibu Media, LLC. (Decker, John) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (klau, ).
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena filed by Malibu Media, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John) Modified text on 7/10/2019 (klau, ).
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena by Malibu Media, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Decker, John) Modified on 7/10/2019 to correct event (klau, ).
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Malibu Media, LLC.. (Decker, John)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against John Doe for Damages for Property Rights Infringement ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6727539.), filed by Malibu Media, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Decker, John) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC. v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC.
Represented By: John Carlin Decker, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?