Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Trustee of the Harry B. Lyon Living Trust Dated April 13, 1998 vs. Daniel Smith et al
Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., TRUSTEE OF THE HARRY B. LYON LIVING TRUST DATED APRIL 13, 1998
Defendant: Deputy Director DANIEL SMITH, KATHERINE LEE ELLIS LYON, NATIONAL PARK FOUNDATION, GEORGE WASHINGTON MASONIC NATIONAL MEMORIAL ASSOCIATION, INC. and Daniel Smith
Case Number: 1:2019cv00903
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. National Park Foundation answer due 9/30/2019. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 8/29/2019. (rban, )
August 28, 2019 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by National Park Foundation. (Hoffman, Ian)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by National Park Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Ian)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 7/31/2019. (rban, )
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Josh Pelletier and Certification of Local Counsel Douglas R. Kay by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Trustee of the Harry B. Lyon Living Trust Dated April 13, 1998. (Kay, Douglas)
July 15, 2019 Notice of Correction re #8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Pelletier and Certification of Local Counsel Douglas R. Kay Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6734867. Filing user has been notified to complete and file the actual pro hac application. (dvanm, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to George Washington Masonic National Memorial Association, Inc., Katherine Lee Ellis Lyon, National Park Foundation, Daniel Smith, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Pelletier and Certification of Local Counsel Douglas R. Kay Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6734867. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Trustee of the Harry B. Lyon Living Trust Dated April 13, 1998. (Kay, Douglas)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Trustee of the Harry B. Lyon Living Trust Dated April 13, 1998. (Kay, Douglas) (Main Document 7 replaced on 7/12/2019) (dvanm, ).
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Trustee of the Harry B. Lyon Living Trust Dated April 13, 1998. (Kay, Douglas) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/12/2019) (dvanm, ).
July 10, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm, )
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., TRUSTEE OF THE HARRY B. LYON LIVING TRUST DATED APRIL 13, 1998. (Kay, Douglas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., TRUSTEE OF THE HARRY B. LYON LIVING TRUST DATED APRIL 13, 1998. (Kay, Douglas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., TRUSTEE OF THE HARRY B. LYON LIVING TRUST DATED APRIL 13, 1998. (Kay, Douglas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., TRUSTEE OF THE HARRY B. LYON LIVING TRUST DATED APRIL 13, 1998. (Kay, Douglas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6731426.), filed by GEORGE WASHINGTON MASONIC NATIONAL MEMORIAL ASSOCIATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kay, Douglas) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/11/2019) (dvanm, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Trustee of the Harry B. Lyon Living Trust Dated April 13, 1998 vs. Daniel Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Director DANIEL SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE LEE ELLIS LYON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL PARK FOUNDATION
Represented By: Ian S. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE WASHINGTON MASONIC NATIONAL MEMORIAL ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Douglas R. Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A., TRUSTEE OF THE HARRY B. LYON LIVING TRUST DATED APRIL 13, 1998
Represented By: Douglas R. Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?