Precision Franchising LLC v. SSAC, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Precision Franchising LLC
Defendant: Andy Conger and SSAC, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00916
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the Plaintiff's Proposed Discovery Plan #12 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and Plaintiff's counsel consents to waiving his appearance at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 4, 2019, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's August 13, 2019 Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the Plaintiff in their Proposed Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The Plaintiff's Proposed Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 09/03/2019. (lgue, )
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Proposed Discovery Plan by Precision Franchising LLC.(Sallis, Justin)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/23/2019. (rban, )
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/23/2019. (rban, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Arthur Pacheco and Certification of Local Counsel Justin L. Sallis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6800377. by Precision Franchising LLC. (Sallis, Justin)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Lloyd Yaffe and Certification of Local Counsel Justin L. Sallis Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6800363. by Precision Franchising LLC. (Sallis, Justin)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(rban, )
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Andy Conger, SSAC, LLC.(klau, )
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service Returned Executed for Summons, Notice, Financial Interest Disclosure Statement, and Complaint as to Andy Conger and SSAC, LLC c/o Andy Conger served on 7/19/2019, answer due for Andy Conger and SSAC, LLC 8/9/19 filed by Precision Franchising LLC. (Sallis, Justin) Modified text on 8/5/2019 to correct event (klau, ).
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andy Conger, SSAC, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued, #2 Notice to Attorney)(aott, )
July 15, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (aott, )
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Andy Conger and SSAC, LLC by Precision Franchising LLC. (Sallis, Justin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Precision Franchising LLC. (Sallis, Justin)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6736669.), filed by Precision Franchising LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Financial Audit, #3 Exhibit C - Precision Tune Auto Sign, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Default, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sallis, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precision Franchising LLC v. SSAC, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Conger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSAC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Franchising LLC
Represented By: Justin Lydell Sallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?