Toledo v. Caldwell et al
Plaintiff: Olga M. Toledo
Defendant: VIP Transport East, Inc. and Isaac Caldwell, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00960
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in the Joint Discovery Plan (Dkt. 5), and taking note of the Scheduling Order (Dkt. 4) entered in this case, the Court makes the following rulings: 1. All discovery shall be concluded by Friday, December 13, 2019. 2. The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. 3. The pretrial conference scheduled for Wednesday, August 21, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. is cancelled. 4. All Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures shall have been completed by August 12, 2019. 5. No "general objection" may be asserted in response to any discovery demand except to preserve the attorney-client privilege and work product protection. (see Order for details) Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 8/21/19. (tfitz, )
August 1, 2019 Filing 5 Joint Discovery Plan Discovery Plan by Isaac Caldwell, Jr, VIP Transport East, Inc..(Falabella, Brittany)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 12/13/2019. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 7/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
July 25, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Berlauk Falabella on behalf of Isaac Caldwell, Jr, VIP Transport East, Inc. (Falabella, Brittany)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by VIP Transport East, Inc.. (Beck, Donald)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Fairfax County Circuit Court By Isaac Caldwell, Jr. and VIP Transport East, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6755984.), filed by Isaac Caldwell, Jr, VIP Transport East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Caldwell Answer, #4 Exhibit C - VIP Answer, #5 Exhibit D - Jury Demand)(Beck, Donald) Modified text on 7/25/2019 (Answer Filed)(klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toledo v. Caldwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIP Transport East, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Brittany Berlauk Falabella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Caldwell, Jr.
Represented By: Donald Cameron Beck, Jr.
Represented By: Brittany Berlauk Falabella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olga M. Toledo
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Trapeni, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?